Charles Gil v. Nancy A. Berryhill
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Steve Kim |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02183 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 09, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, October 19, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
order
Awarding EAJA Fees
Fri 10/19 11:09 AM
ORDER AWARDING EAJA FEES by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. Re: Stipulation for Award of EAJA Fees33 . IT IS ORDERED that based upon the parties' Stipulation for the Award and Payment of Equal Access to Justice (EAJA) Fees, Plaintiff shall be awarded attorney fees under EAJA in the amount of THREE THOUSAND FIVE HUNDRED DOLLARS and 00/100 cents ($3,500.00) as authorized by 28 U.S.C. 2412(d), and subject to the terms of the above-referenced Stipulation. (hr) |
|
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
stip
Award of EAJA Fees
Thu 10/18 3:58 PM
First STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees in the amount of $3,500.00. filed by Plaintiff Charles Gil.(Leidner, Suzanne) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix | ||
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Tue 10/09 8:50 PM
MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by PLAINTIFF Charles Gil. EAJA APPLICATION(Leidner, Suzanne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT "A" | ||
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
judgmentCV
Judgment
Mon 07/09 10:02 AM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. It is ADJUDGED that this action is reversed and remanded for further proceedings pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C § 405(g) and consistent with the accompanying Opinion and Order. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (clee) |
|
30 | 30
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 07/09 10:00 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REVERSING DECISION OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE LAW JUDGE AND REMANDING FOR FURTHER ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEEDINGS by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. For these reasons, the decision of the Commissioner is REVERSED and this action is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this Order. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. IT IS SO ORDERED. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (clee) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 04/09 3:02 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES by U.S. Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. Effective, April 12, 2018, Judge Kim will be located at the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, COURTROOM 540 on the 5th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 540 of the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse. Magistrate Judge Kim's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Connie Lee, may be reached at (213) 894-4436. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
stip
Joint Stipulation for Social Security Cases
Tue 03/13 8:21 AM
JOINT STIPULATION, on behalf of both parties, for Disposition of Claim from Relief From Decision of the Commissioner, filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Bolin, Timothy) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 01/19 9:46 AM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. IT IS ORDERED, the Plaintiff shall have an extension up to and including January 19, 2018, to prepare Plaintiff's Joint Submission and all other dates are adjusted accordingly. The final Joint Stipulation will be filed on or before March 16, 2018. In re: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File26 (mkr) |
|
26 | 26
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 01/19 7:40 AM
Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Joint Submission In Social Security Case filed by Plaintiff Charles Gil.(Leidner, Suzanne) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 01/18 9:01 AM
NOTICE of Nondelivery of Plaintiff's Portion of Joint Submission filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Bolin, Timothy) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 01/16 3:21 PM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. IT IS ORDERED, that Plaintiff shall have an extension up to and including January 17, 2018, to prepare Plaintiff's Joint Submission and all other dates are adjusted accordingly. The final Joint Stipulation will be filed on or before March 14, 2018. In re: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File23 (mkr) |
|
23 | 23
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 01/16 2:44 PM
First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Joint Subission filed by Plaintiff Charles Gil.(Leidner, Suzanne) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 01/04 9:32 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. On August 31, 2017, the Court issued an Order Extending Briefing Schedule. (ECF No.18 ). According to the adjusted briefing schedule, Plaintiff was to deliver to Defendant their portion of the joint submission on or before November 10, 2017. As of the date of this Order, however, Plaintiff has not provided his part of the joint submission to Defendant, nor has he filed a request for an extension of time to do so. (ECF No.21 ). Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE on or before January 12, 2018, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff may discharge this Order to Show Cause by providing his portion of the joint submission to Defendant by no later than January 12, 2018. (mkr) |
|
Sunday, December 31, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Sun 12/31 5:47 AM
NOTICE Nondelivery of Plaintiff's Portion of the Joint Submission filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Bolin, Timothy) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Fri 09/01 11:39 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV17-2183 SK on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Thu 08/31 10:45 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Charles Gil. (Leidner, Suzanne) |
|
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 08/31 8:16 AM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have an extension up to and including September 8, 2017 to prepare Plaintiff's Settlement Letter and all other dates are adjusted accordingly. In re: Stipulation for Extension of Time17 (mkr) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 08/30 4:21 PM
First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Joint Stipulation in Social Security Case filed by Plaintiff Charles Gil.(Leidner, Suzanne) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respoth
Administrative Record
Mon 08/07 11:31 AM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF CHARLES GIL (mj) filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Bolin, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 08/07 11:26 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 (mj) filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill.(Bolin, Timothy) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 08/03 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Nondelivery filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Bolin, Timothy) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 08/02 8:56 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) RE: CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. Defendant has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge for all proceedings. (ECF No.11 ). Plaintiff is advised that, to encourage the just and speedy determination of cases filed in this District, the parties may consent to have a U.S. Magistrate Judge render final judgment. By no later than 7 calendar days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall file a completed form CV-11 with the Clerk indicating whether Plaintiff does or does not join in Defendant's consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (mkr) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 06/26 9:04 AM
NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING SERVICE OF CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF CHARLES GIL filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (mj) (Bolin, Timothy) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Wed 04/19 1:12 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Timothy R Bolin added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Bolin, Timothy) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (60 days)
Mon 04/10 4:56 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Charles Gil, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 3/28/2017, answer due 5/30/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Leidner, Suzanne) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Thu 03/23 9:28 AM
ORDER re: Procedures in Social Security Appeal (Joint Submission Format) by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. Plaintiff will promptly serve the summons and complaint on the government in accordance with Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff will file an appropriate proof of service within 30 days of the date of this Order. Government counsel must file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the action. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (mkr) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/23 9:25 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued, In re: Complaint1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (mkr) |
|
7 | 7
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Thu 03/23 9:23 AM
ORDER re Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby GRANTED. In re:5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (mkr) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 10:53 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Tue 03/21 9:37 AM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Charles Gil. (Leidner, Suzanne) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/21 9:35 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Charles Gil. (Leidner, Suzanne) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/21 9:33 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Charles Gil, (Leidner, Suzanne) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/21 9:31 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Charles Gil. (Leidner, Suzanne) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 9:29 AM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by plaintiff Charles Gil. (Attorney Suzanne C Leidner added to party Charles Gil(pty:pla))(Leidner, Suzanne) |