Foundation Law Group LLP v. Weiru Wang et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Otis D Wright, II |
Referred: | Karen L Stevenson |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02186 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 28:1338 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 1:31 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Foundations Law Office
|
|
Defendant
Weiru Wang
|
|
Plaintiff
Foundation Law Group LLP
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Wed 05/03 3:49 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (smo) |
|
Att: 1 Order Closing Case | ||
14 | 14
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 05/03 3:42 PM
ORDER Granting Dismissal of the Entire Action with Prejudice by Judge Otis D. Wright, II, re: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))13 . Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), the entire action and all claims asserted therein are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. All dates and deadlines in this action are vacated and taken off calendar. The Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (smo) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Tue 05/02 1:05 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Foundation Law Group LLP. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Demirjian, Sevag) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/24 12:08 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint1 as to Defendant Foundations Law Office. (lom) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/23 1:35 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Foundation Law Group LLP. (Demirjian, Sevag) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/23 1:28 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint1 as to Defendant Weiru Wang. (lom) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/23 10:24 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Foundation Law Group LLP. (Demirjian, Sevag) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Deficiency in Summons
Thu 03/23 10:19 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request6 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. Please add the Judge's initials next to the case number. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Wed 03/22 9:28 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Foundation Law Group LLP. (Demirjian, Sevag) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/22 8:50 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Foundation Law Group LLP. (Demirjian, Sevag) |
|
5 | 5
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 03/22 8:31 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central District's website for additional information. See document for requirements. (lom) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Tue 03/21 3:01 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: Attachment 2 Civil Cover Sheet and attachment 3 Notice of Interested Parties should have been e-filed separately and in their own event category. The Civil Cover Sheet is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. The Notice of Interested Parties is located under Civil Events Other Filings Notices. No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (car) |
|
3 | 3
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 2:46 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 2:46 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 11:47 AM
COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (400 paid on 03/21/2017, receipt number 261DDL9K), filed by plaintiff Foundation Law Group LLP. (Attorney Sevag Demirjian added to party Foundation Law Group LLP(pty:pla))(Demirjian, Sevag) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Interested Parties |