Arlen B. Fisher v. Synchrony Bank et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia A Phillips |
Referred: | Alicia G Rosenberg |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02192 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 47:0227 Violation of Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 1:23 AM PDT |
Defendant
Allied Interstate, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Synchrony Bank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arlene B Fisher
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 12/20 4:43 PM
ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party30 : Upon review of the Parties' Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendants Synchrony Bank and Allied Interstate LLC, and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulation is GRANTED. The above-entitled matter is hereby dismissed with prejudice, as to Synchrony Bank and Allied Interstate LLC, with the parties to bear their own attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses. (bm) |
|
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
stip
Dismiss Party
Fri 12/14 1:35 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss defendants Allied Interstate, LLC, Synchrony Bank filed by Plaintiff Arlene B Fisher.(Price, Stuart) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 02/27 1:38 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO ARBITRATE CLAIMS AND STAY LAWSUIT by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Stipulation to Stay Case28 Upon review of the Parties Joint Stipulation to Arbitrate Claims and Stay Lawsuit, it is hereby ORDERED: To the extent Plaintiffs claims are not otherwise resolved by the Parties, Plaintiff shall submit his claims to arbitration pursuant to the Parties arbitration agreement. This case is STAYED pending arbitration of Plaintiffs claims. (yl) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
stip
Stay Case
Tue 02/20 1:43 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Arbitration filed by Defendants Allied Interstate, LLC, Synchrony Bank.(Frampton, Zachary) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation To Arbitrate Claims And Stay Lawsuit | ||
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Stay Case
Thu 07/27 2:32 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY ACTION [DOC. NO. 19] by Judge Virginia A. Phillips granting19 MOTION to Stay Case: Given the absence of prejudice to Plaintiff, the possibility that the ACA Int'l ruling may affect Plaintiff's claims against Defendants, and the advanced stage of proceedings in ACA Int'l, the Court finds that a stay is appropriate and GRANTS the Defendants' motion to stay the proceedings pending a ruling by the D.C. Circuit in ACA Int'l. Accordingly, for the reasons stated above, Defendant's motion to stay action is GRANTED. (see document for further details) (bm) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
minutes
Motion Hearing ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Stay Case
Thu 07/27 9:28 AM
MINUTES OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING RULING ON THE D. C. CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS; [DOC. NO. 19] taking under submission19 MOTION to Stay Case Hearing held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Matter called. Counsel make their appearance. Court issues a tentative ruling, hears oral argument and takes the matter under submission. Scheduling conference is taken off calendar. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston. (bm) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 07/06 11:08 AM
MINUTE ORDER CHANGING DATE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: On June 1, 2017, Defendants Synchrony Bank and Allied Interstate, LLC, filed a motion to stay case. (Doc. No. 19.) The hearing on this motion, presently set for 2:00 p.m. July 10, 2017, are rescheduled to 2:00 p.m. on July 24, 2017. The Court will conduct the Parties' scheduling conference, if necessary, after the hearing on the motion to stay on July 24, 2017. (bm) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 06/26 4:24 PM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Ruling By The D.C. Circuit Court Of Appeals 19 filed by Defendants Allied Interstate, LLC, Synchrony Bank. (Frampton, Zachary) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
adr
Request for ADR Procedure No. 1 - (ADR-1)
Thu 06/22 1:10 PM
REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 1 filed. Parties request Filed by Plaintiff Arlene B Fisher.(Price, Stuart) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Thu 06/22 12:27 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 days, filed by Plaintiff Arlene B Fisher.. (Price, Stuart) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 06/19 10:24 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Plaintiff Arlene B Fisher.(Price, Stuart) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
For Judicial Notice
Thu 06/01 8:43 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Ruling By The D.C. Circuit Court Of Appeals 19 filed by Defendants Allied Interstate, LLC, Synchrony Bank. (Frampton, Zachary) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Stay Case
Thu 06/01 8:34 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Ruling By The D.C. Circuit Court Of Appeals filed by Defendants Allied Interstate, LLC, Synchrony Bank. Motion set for hearing on 7/10/2017 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Frampton, Zachary) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Synchrony Bank And Allied Interstate, LLCs, Motion To Stay Pending Ruling By The D.C. Circuit Court Of Appeals | ||
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Fri 04/28 1:31 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for 7/10/2017 at 01:30 PM before Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh) |
|
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 04/28 12:17 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Allied Interstate, LLC.(Frampton, Zachary) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 04/27 6:16 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Synchrony Bank.(Frampton, Zachary) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/21 5:23 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Allied Interstate, LLC identifying iQor US, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Frampton, Zachary) |
|
14 | 14
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 04/21 5:21 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Allied Interstate, LLC answer now due 4/28/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Allied Interstate, LLC.(Attorney Zachary C Frampton added to party Allied Interstate, LLC(pty:dft))(Frampton, Zachary) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/20 10:28 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Synchrony Bank identifying Synchrony Financial as Corporate Parent. (Frampton, Zachary) |
|
12 | 12
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 04/20 10:22 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Synchrony Bank answer now due 4/27/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Synchrony Bank.(Attorney Zachary C Frampton added to party Synchrony Bank(pty:dft))(Frampton, Zachary) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 04/05 10:17 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Arlene B Fisher, upon Defendant Synchrony Bank served on 3/30/2017, answer due 4/20/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Eva Willat, paralegal received for Synchrony in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Price, Stuart) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 04/04 3:29 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Arlene B Fisher, upon Defendant Allied Interstate, LLC served on 3/31/2017, answer due 4/21/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cynthia Byers as Office Manager/Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Price, Stuart) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 03/23 9:08 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (ab) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 2:04 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Allied Interstate, LLC, Synchrony Bank. (et) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 2:02 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 2:02 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/21 12:49 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Plaintiff Arlene B Fisher. (Price, Stuart) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/21 12:49 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Plaintiff Arlene B Fisher. (Price, Stuart) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/21 12:47 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Arlene B Fisher, (Price, Stuart) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/21 12:46 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Arlene B Fisher. (Price, Stuart) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 12:44 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19549558 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Arlene B Fisher. (Attorney Stuart M Price added to party Arlene B Fisher(pty:pla))(Price, Stuart) |