Greta Verrett-Briley v. Commissioner of SSA
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Suzanne H Segal |
Referred: | Suzanne H Segal |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02196 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 09, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
order
Awarding EAJA Fees
Tue 04/10 3:03 PM
ORDER AWARDING EAJA FEES by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. Re: Stipulation for Award of EAJA Fees35 . (See order for details) (hr) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
stip
Award of EAJA Fees
Fri 04/06 12:36 PM
Joint STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees in the amount of $14,000.00. filed by PLAINTIFF Greta Verrett-Briley.(Drake, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 03/26 10:35 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) MINUTE ORDER RE PETITION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES UNDER THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: The parties are ordered to hold a telephonic settlement conference regarding the EAJA fee request within fourteen (14) days of this Order. If no agreement is reached, the parties shall file briefs according to the following schedule: The Government's Opposition to the Motion shall be filed no later than twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, or by April 16, 2018. Plaintiff's Reply, if necessary, shall be filed no later than seven (7) days from the service of the Opposition. The matter will then be taken under submission. (See document for further details). (mr) |
|
Saturday, March 24, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Attorney Fees
Sat 03/24 7:21 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by PlAINTIFF Greta Verrett-Briley. (Drake, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
judgmentCV
Judgment
Tue 01/09 9:46 AM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal, Related to: MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER,31 . IT IS ADJUDGED that the decision of the Commissioner is REVERSED and that the above-captioned action is REMANDED to the Commissioner for further action consistent with the Courts Memorandum Decision and Order. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (mr) |
|
31 | 31
16
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Tue 01/09 9:43 AM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. IT IS ORDERED that Judgment be entered REVERSING the decision of the Commissioner and REMANDING this matter for further proceedings consistent with this decision. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court serve copies of this Order and the Judgment on counsel for both parties. (See document for further details). (mr) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Extension of Time to File
Wed 12/13 9:43 AM
ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: Granting29 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Hereby orders that attorney for plaintiff has had numerous other district court briefs preceding this brief and would therefore request up to an including January 15, 2018, to provide her reply to the court. The plaintiff respectfully thanks the court in advance of service. ***NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT*** (mr) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 12/12 8:22 PM
REQUEST for Extension of Time to File REPLY PORTIONS OF JOINT STIPULATION filed by PLAINTIFF Greta Verrett-Briley. (Drake, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Tue 11/28 9:16 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendant's Answer filed by Defendant Commissioner of SSA. (Wiesbrock, Stacy) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 10/31 9:10 AM
ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION TO EXCEED 25-PAGE LIMIT AND TO FILE SEPARATE DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal, re: Notice of Motion,24 . The plaintiff shall be permitted to exceed the 25-page opening brief limit and to have the documents filed separately rather than combined into one document, as 1a) Plaintiffs opening brief; 1b) Plaintiffs medical summary; 2) Defendants response brief; and 3) Plaintiffs reply brief. The plaintiffs opening brief shall not exceed 42 pages in length. (mz) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Motion Related Document
Wed 10/25 3:24 PM
OPENING BRIEF re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File JOINT STIPULATON22 filed by Plaintiff Greta Verrett-Briley.(Drake, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix | ||
25 | 25
respm
Motion Related Document
Wed 10/25 3:17 PM
NEW EVIDENCE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File JOINT STIPULATON22 filed by Plaintiff Greta Verrett-Briley.(Drake, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement | ||
24 | 24
respm
Notice of Motion
Wed 10/25 2:38 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File JOINT STIPULATON22 EXCEED PAGE LENGTH filed by Plaintiff Greta Verrett-Briley.(Drake, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Extension of Time to File
Mon 09/18 4:28 PM
ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: Granting22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File. For good cause shown, the plaintiff shall have up to an including October 28, 2017, to provide her opening brief and the defendant shall have up to and including November 28, 2017, to file her brief. Plaintiffs Reply due December 12, 2017. No further extensions.***NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT*** (mr) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 09/11 8:33 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File JOINT STIPULATON filed by PLAINTIFF Greta Verrett-Briley. (Drake, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respoth
Administrative Record
Tue 08/22 9:40 AM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF GRETA VERRETT-BRILEY (mj) filed by Defendant Commissioner of SSA.(Wiesbrock, Stacy) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3 | ||
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 08/22 9:30 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 (mj) filed by Defendant Commissioner of SSA.(Wiesbrock, Stacy) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Extension of Time to File Withdraw Motion
Tue 08/01 4:03 PM
ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF EXTENSION OF TIME MOTION by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: terminating17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File and granting18 MOTION to Withdraw Motion. (mz) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Withdraw Motion/Application/Request/Ex Parte Application
Fri 07/28 2:34 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Withdraw NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File JOINT STIPULATON17 filed by PLAINTIFF Greta Verrett-Briley. (Drake, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 07/28 1:24 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File JOINT STIPULATON filed by PLAINTIFF Greta Verrett-Briley. (Drake, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/11 9:39 AM
NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING SERVICE OF CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF GRETA VERRETT-BRILEY filed by Defendant Commissioner of SSA. (mj) (Wiesbrock, Stacy) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final
Tue 05/02 10:53 AM
STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by PLAINTIFF Greta Verrett-Briley. (Drake, Kenneth) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Mon 05/01 10:50 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV17-2196 SS on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Fri 04/28 5:23 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by PLAINTIFF Greta Verrett-Briley. (Drake, Kenneth) |
|
12 | 12
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (60 days)
Fri 04/28 4:29 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Greta Verrett-Briley, upon Defendant Commissioner of SSA served on 4/28/2017, answer due 6/27/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to unknown. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to unknown. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to unlegible. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Drake, Kenneth) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Tue 04/25 11:47 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by DEFENDANT Commissioner of SSA. (Attorney Stacy Wiesbrock added to party Commissioner of SSA(pty:dft))(Wiesbrock, Stacy) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Mon 04/10 2:01 PM
ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. Plaintiff will file an appropriate proof of service within 30 days of the date of this Order. (See document for further details). (mr) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/10 2:00 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Commissioner of SSA. (mr) |
|
Sunday, April 09, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Summons Request
Sun 04/09 8:44 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by PLAINTIFF Greta Verrett-Briley. (Drake, Kenneth) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Leave to Appeal IFP
Fri 03/31 2:42 PM
ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: Granting4 REQUEST for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis. (mr) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Wed 03/22 12:00 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis 4 . The following error(s) was found: The incorrect Event of Notice of Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis was selected in e-filing the document. The correct event is Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support. The clerk has modified the docket entry to reflect the correct title of the form. Please note that the document was e-filed upside down. No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 11:39 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (car) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/21 2:49 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis filed by PLAINTIFF GRETA VERRETT-BRILEY. (Drake, Kenneth) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/21 2:18 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff GRETA VERRETT-BRILEY. (Drake, Kenneth) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/21 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF GRETA VERRETT-BRILEY, (Drake, Kenneth) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 2:07 PM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by PLAINTIFF GRETA VERRETT-BRILEY. (Attorney Kenneth W Drake added to party GRETA VERRETT-BRILEY(pty:pla))(Drake, Kenneth) |