Josh Ketroser v. Wasserman Media Group, LLC
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dale S Fischer |
Referred: | Gail J Standish |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02201 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 09, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 1:51 AM PDT |
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Defendant
Wasserman Media Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Josh Ketroser
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, October 09, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Status Report
Mon 10/09 11:00 AM
STATUS REPORT (Jointly Submitted) filed by Plaintiff Josh Ketroser. (Vanderpool, Tyler) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Status Report
Fri 08/04 12:25 PM
STATUS REPORT (Jointly Submitted) filed by Plaintiff Josh Ketroser. (Vanderpool, Tyler) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
textonly
Text Only Notice of Judicial Move to Roybal Federal Building
Tue 06/06 4:50 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES: Effective June 1, 2017, Judge Standish is located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 640 on the 6th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 640 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Compel Arbitration
Mon 06/05 11:04 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Action Pending Completion of Arbitration (Dkt. 23) by Judge Dale S. Fischer: (SEE MEMORANDUM FOR SPECIFICS) (bp) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 05/30 1:53 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion to Compel Arbitration off calendar and under submission. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dp) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 05/30 9:24 AM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting27 Non-Resident Attorney Darren A. Heitner APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, Josh Ktroser, designating Ryan D. Saba as local counsel. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp) |
|
28 | 28
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Fri 05/26 2:55 PM
OBJECTION in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration23 (Objection to Evidence Offered in Support of Reply [Dkt. No. 26]) filed by Plaintiff Josh Ketroser. (Vanderpool, Tyler) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Thu 05/25 3:40 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Darren A. Heitner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Josh Ketroser (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19919474) filed by Plaintiff Josh Ketroser. (Vanderpool, Tyler) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 05/22 3:24 PM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration23 filed by Defendant Wasserman Media Group, LLC.(Deixler, Bert) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Kayla Perkins, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Joshua W. Sussman | ||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Mon 05/15 12:23 PM
OPPOSITION In Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration23 filed by Plaintiff Josh Ketroser.(Meyer, Krystle) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Plaintiff, Josh Ketroser, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Ryan D. Saba, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B | ||
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 05/04 11:14 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wasserman Media Group, LLC, (Sussman, Joshua) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Compel Arbitration
Fri 04/28 2:56 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Wasserman Media Group, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/5/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Deixler, Bert) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Kayla Perkins, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Joshua W. Sussman, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Response
Mon 04/17 12:44 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Josh Ketroserto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,16 (Meyer, Krystle) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
21 | 21
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Mon 04/17 12:28 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Josh Ketroser(Meyer, Krystle) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Leave to File Document Under Seal
Tue 04/11 4:31 PM
ORDER RE: APPLICATION OF WASSERMAN MEDIA GROUP, LLC FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL17 by Judge Dale S. Fischer: (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 04/04 2:38 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Wasserman Media Group, LLC, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,18 served on April 4, 2017. (Sussman, Joshua) |
|
18 | 18
attyseal
Sealed Declaration in Support
Tue 04/04 12:26 PM
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal17 filed by Defendant Wasserman Media Group, LLC.(Sussman, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Unredacted Document Complaint Part 1, | ||
Att: 2 Unredacted Document Complaint Part 2 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Leave to File Document Under Seal
Tue 04/04 12:23 PM
APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendant Wasserman Media Group, LLC.(Attorney Joshua W Sussman added to party Wasserman Media Group, LLC(pty:dft))(Sussman, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Redacted Document Complaint Part 1, | ||
Att: 2 Redacted Document Complaint Part 2, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Joshua W. Sussman, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 04/03 10:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers): Order DISMISSING Case for Lack of SubjectMatter Jurisdiction by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Therefore, the complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend no later than April 17, 2017. Defendant is ordered to provide discovery regarding the citizenships of Defendant's members if such discovery is necessary. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 03/30 12:57 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Josh Ketroser, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,,7 served on 3/30/2017. (Meyer, Krystle) |
|
14 | 14
order
Leave to File Document Under Seal Withdraw
Thu 03/30 12:44 PM
(In Chambers) Order DENYING Motion to Withdraw Complaint and Application for Leave to File Under Seal (Dkt. Nos.8 ,10 ) by Judge Dale S. Fischer: The motions are denied. See minute order for specifics. (ah) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 03/28 3:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Wasserman Media Group, LLC, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,11 AMENDED served on March 27 & 28, 2017. (Deixler, Bert) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 03/27 5:32 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Wasserman Media Group, LLC, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,11 served on March 27, 2017. (Deixler, Bert) |
|
11 | 11
attyseal
Sealed Declaration in Support
Mon 03/27 3:39 PM
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Complaint and Exhibits under seal8 filed by Defendant Wasserman Media Group, LLC.(Attorney Bert H Deixler added to party Wasserman Media Group, LLC(pty:dft))(Deixler, Bert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Withdraw
Thu 03/23 1:38 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Withdraw Publicly-Filed Complaint Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Josh Ketroser. (Meyer, Krystle) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
attyseal
Sealed Declaration in Support
Thu 03/23 1:30 PM
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Complaint and Exhibits under seal8 filed by Plaintiff Josh Ketroser.(Meyer, Krystle) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Unredacted Document | ||
8 | 8
motion
Leave to File Document Under Seal
Thu 03/23 1:25 PM
APPLICATION to file document Complaint and Exhibits under seal filed by Plaintiff Josh Ketroser.(Meyer, Krystle) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Redacted Document | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/22 1:38 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Courts website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judges Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dp) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 9:31 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Wasserman Media Group, LLC. (jtil) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 6:22 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 6:21 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (jtil) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/21 3:21 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Josh Ketroser. (Saba, Ryan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/21 3:18 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Josh Ketroser. (Saba, Ryan) |
|
1 | 1
74
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 3:13 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19551594 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Josh Ketroser. (Attorney Ryan D Saba added to party Josh Ketroser(pty:pla))(Saba, Ryan) |