Andres Gomez v. Verazas Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Karen L Stevenson |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02215 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 2:36 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Verazas Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Andres Gomez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Tue 08/15 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Andres Gomez. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Au, Roland) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 07/26 2:46 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL BY CLERK FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge George H. Wu: On June 23, 2017, an Order to Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution12 was issued for the following reason: Failure to comply with FRCP 4(m), requiring plaintiff(s) to serve the summons and complaint upon all defendants within 90 days after filing the complaint. Plaintiff was given until July 7, 2017 to respond and no response or objection has been filed. Plaintiff is hereby notified that this action is dismissed without prejudice. (Case Terminated. Made JS-6.) (cr) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 06/23 3:12 PM
(IN CHAMBERS): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge George H. Wu. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 7/7/2017. (kss) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 06/19 1:21 PM
Notice Update: Judge Stevenson will conduct all Court appearances in Courtroom 580, 5th floor located at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 E. Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. Please update your records to reflect this change. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 06/05 12:09 PM
Effective June 8, 2017, Judge Stevenson will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, Suite 8100, on the 8th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 570 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Tue 04/04 12:31 PM
Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
cs_rasgn
Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV 89)
Thu 03/30 4:54 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-02215 GW(KSx). (rn) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 1:15 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Verazas Inc. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 1:04 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 1:03 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/21 9:52 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ANDRES GOMEZ, (Au, Roland) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/21 9:51 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ANDRES GOMEZ. (Au, Roland) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/21 9:50 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff ANDRES GOMEZ. (Au, Roland) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 9:49 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19553688 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff ANDRES GOMEZ. (Attorney Roland Au added to party ANDRES GOMEZ(pty:pla))(Au, Roland) |