Drake Von Walker v. J. Sutton
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Christina A Snyder |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00529 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 02, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Certificate of Appealability - Order of USDC
Wed 10/03 11:57 AM
Order by Judge Christina A. Snyder denying Certificate of Appealability. (mat) |
|
17 | 17
judgmentCV
Judgment
Wed 10/03 11:36 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder, in favor of J. Sutton against Drake Von Walker Related to: R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations16 . IT IS ADJUDGED that the Petition is denied, and this action dismissed with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (sbou) |
|
16 | 16
order
R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations
Wed 10/03 11:30 AM
ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Christina A. Snyder for Report and Recommendation. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Judgment be entered denying the Petition. (See document for details.) (sbou) |
|
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
reportrecommend
Report and Recommendation (Miscellaneous)
Thu 09/27 11:32 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick Re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254),1 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(nbo) |
||
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
reportrecommend
Report and Recommendation (Issued)
Fri 08/17 10:31 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254),1 . IT THEREFORE IS RECOMMENDED that the District Court issue an Order: (1) accepting this Report and Recommendation; and (2) directing that Judgment be entered denying the Petition and dismissing this action with prejudice. (See document for further information.) (dv) |
|
14 | 14
reportrecommend
Notice of Report and Recommendation
Fri 08/17 10:26 AM
NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. Objections to R&R due by 9/6/2018. (dv) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 05/29 4:32 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Adrianne S Denault counsel for Respondent J. Sutton. Filed by Respondent J. Sutton. (Attorney Adrianne S Denault added to party J. Sutton(pty:res))(Denault, Adrianne) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Lodging
Wed 06/28 10:30 AM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Answer to Complaint11(Truong, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Lodgment #1 Clerk's Transcript in Case No. G052145 (Vol 1 of 3), | ||
Att: 2 Lodgment #1 Clerk's Transcript in Case No. G052145 (Vol 2 of 3), | ||
Att: 3 Lodgment #1 Clerk's Transcript in Case No. G052145 (Vol 3 of 3), | ||
Att: 4 Lodgment #2 Reporter's Master Index Case No. G052145, | ||
Att: 5 Lodgment #2 Reporter's Transcript Case No. G052145 (Vol 1 of 3), | ||
Att: 6 Lodgment #2 Reporter's Transcript Case No. G052145 (Vol 2 of 3), | ||
Att: 7 Lodgment #2 Reporter's Transcript Case No. G052145 (Vol 3 of 3), | ||
Att: 8 Lodgment #3 Reporter's Augmented Transcript in Case No. G052145, | ||
Att: 9 Lodgment #4 Appellant's Opening Brief in Case No. G052145., | ||
Att: 10 Lodgment #5 Respondent's Brief in Case No. G052145, | ||
Att: 11 Lodgment #6 Appellant's Reply Brief in Case No. G052145, | ||
Att: 12 Lodgment #7 Opinion, California Court of Appeal in Case No. G052145., | ||
Att: 13 Lodgment #8 Petition for Review in Case No. S234923., | ||
Att: 14 Lodgment #9 Order Denying Review in Case No. S234923. | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 06/28 10:16 AM
ANSWER to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254),1 filed by Respondent J. Sutton.(Truong, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum | ||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Enlargement of Time to File
Tue 06/13 10:50 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: GRANTING9 Second Enlargement of time in which to file a response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is extended until July 7, 2017. (es) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Enlargement of Time to File Document
Tue 05/30 11:54 AM
Second APPLICATION for Enlargement of Time to File a Response to Petition for WHC filed by Respondent J. Sutton. (Truong, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 05/10 12:21 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: Granting7 APPLICATION for Enlargement of Time in which to File Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to 6/7/2017. (mt) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extend Time to File Answer
Mon 05/01 12:56 PM
First APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 6/7/2017 filed by Respondent J. Sutton. (Truong, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
attorney
Attorney Appearance or Reassignment for the California Attorney General
Mon 05/01 12:38 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of California Attorney General Office Jennifer B. Truong on behalf of Respondent J. Sutton. California Attorney General Daniel Brian Rogers terminated. (Attorney Jennifer B Truong added to party J. Sutton(pty:res))(Truong, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
attorney
Attorney Appearance or Reassignment for the California Attorney General
Fri 04/07 11:34 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of California Attorney General Office Daniel Rogers on behalf of Respondent J. Sutton. (Attorney Daniel Brian Rogers added to party J. Sutton(pty:res))(Rogers, Daniel) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
4
pgs
order
Order Requiring Return/Answer to Petition
Fri 03/24 3:54 PM
ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (nbo) |
|
Att: 1 Petition | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 4:46 PM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Christina A. Snyder and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (et) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate - DECLINED by Party
Tue 03/21 4:46 PM
ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Petitioner Drake Von Walker. The Petitioner does not consent. (et) |
|
1 | 1
36
pgs
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)
Tue 03/21 4:45 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254); Evidentiary Hearing Requested. Case assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (Filing fee $ 5 FEE DUE.), filed by Petitioner Drake Von Walker. (et) |