Coachella Valley Water District v. Doxo, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John A Kronstadt |
Referred: | David T Bristow |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00530 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 2:13 AM PDT |
Defendant
Doxo, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Coachella Valley Water District
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago |
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 08/25 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Coachella Valley Water District. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Welles, G) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Dismissing Case
Tue 08/22 8:52 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt, re Status Report22 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (pso) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Status Report
Fri 08/18 3:48 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) filed by Defendant Doxo, Inc.. (Baehr, Alexander) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Stipulation and Order
Fri 06/30 12:50 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF STAY PENDING COMPLETION OF MEDIATION20 by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Mediation deadline August 16, 2017. The case deadlines are stayed until the mediation is complete. On or before August 20, 2017, the parties shall file a joint status report stating the outcome of the mediation and whether a settlement has been reached as to all or part of the matter. If the mediation does not fully resolve the case the Defendant shall answer the Complaint by no later than August 29, 2017. (ah) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
stip
Stay Case
Wed 06/28 10:57 AM
STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Completion of Mediation filed by Plaintiff Doxo, Inc..(Baehr, Alexander) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation for Extension of Stay Pending Completion of Mediation | ||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 05/25 12:55 PM
ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MEDIATION CUT-OFF DATE TO STAY CASE AND RELATED DEADLINES by Judge John A. Kronstadt, re Stipulation to Continue18 .(SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
stip
Continue
Fri 05/19 3:50 PM
STIPULATION to Continue mediation cut-off date from May 30, 2017 to June 21, 2017 filed by plaintiff Coachella Valley Water District.(Welles, G) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 05/01 2:14 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO STAY CASE AND RELATED DEADLINES PENDING MEDIATION by Judge John A. Kronstadt,15 . The Parties shall: 1. Pursuant to Civil L.R. 16-15.4, mediate this matter pursuant to ADR Procedure NO. 3 before the Hon. Rosalyn Chapman , with such mediation to conclude by May 31, 2017.2. The case deadlines are stayed until the mediation is complete. Upon completion of mediation, or by June 6, 2017, the parties shall file either a notice of settlement or a joint report stating the outcome of the mediation. If a settlement is reached, the notice shall include a date by which a dismissal will be filed. If a settlement is not reached, the joint report shall include the status of the settlement and whether discussions are ongoing or a further mediation session is scheduled. The report shall not disclose the substantive contents of any settlement discussions between the parties. 3. If the mediation does not fully resolve the case, the Defendant shall answer the Complaint by no later than June 6, 2017. (pso) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)
Fri 04/21 4:34 PM
ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Stipulated Motion to Stay Case14 , for the following reasons: Other: Motions are set for hearing and briefed pursuant to L.R. 6-1. Stipulations are not. Counsel have refiled the document as a stipulation with a proposed order, which is the proper manner in which to submit agreed upon matters to the Court. Accordingly, Dkt. 14 is stricken. The Court will consider Dkt. 15 (bm) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Stay Case
Thu 04/20 12:01 PM
STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Mediation filed by Defendant Doxo, Inc. Doxo, Inc..(Baehr, Alexander) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Stay Case | ||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Stay Case
Wed 04/19 5:24 PM
STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Mediation filed by Defendant Doxo, Inc..(Baehr, Alexander) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/14 12:55 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting12 Non-Resident Attorney Alexander A. Baehr APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant, DOXO, Inc., designating Ekwan E. Rhow as local counsel. (bp) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Mon 04/10 4:16 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexander A. Baehr to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Doxo, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19661011) filed by defendant Doxo, Inc.. (Rhow, Ekwan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, # ( 2) Certificate of Good Standing | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 04/10 4:03 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ekwan E Rhow counsel for Defendant Doxo, Inc.. Adding Ekwan E. Rhow as counsel of record for Doxo, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Doxo, Inc.. (Attorney Ekwan E Rhow added to party Doxo, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rhow, Ekwan) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Thu 03/23 4:44 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Coachella Valley Water District. (Welles, G) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Wed 03/22 3:21 PM
STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (ah) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Copyright/Patent/Trademark (CV-31) (Notice to Counsel) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 9:09 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (et) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 9:07 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Doxo, Inc. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 9:03 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 9:02 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (et) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/21 3:55 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Coachella Valley Water District, (Welles, G) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/21 3:52 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Coachella Valley Water District. (Welles, G) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/21 3:46 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Coachella Valley Water District. (Welles, G) |
|
1 | 1
14
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 3:39 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19551761 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Coachella Valley Water District. (Attorney G Henry Welles added to party Coachella Valley Water District(pty:pla))(Welles, G) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E |