Ruben Paul Gonzales v. Adam Chiropractic et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew J Guilford |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00504 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 2:09 AM PDT |
Defendant
Elias S. Adam
|
|
Defendant
Adam Chiropractic
|
|
Plaintiff
Ruben Paul Gonzales
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 86 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 04/20 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Ruben Paul Gonzales. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Borthwick, Douglas) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 03/27 9:58 PM
MINUTE IN CHAMBERS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 4/24/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (mt) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 4:33 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Elias S. Adam(as trustee of Elias S. Adam Living Trust). (ghap) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 4:32 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Elias S. Adam(individual). (ghap) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 4:31 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Adam Chiropractic. (ghap) |
|
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 4:19 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 4:19 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/21 12:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ruben Paul Gonzales. (Politiski, Richard) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/21 12:22 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Ruben Paul Gonzales, (Politiski, Richard) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/21 11:52 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Ruben Paul Gonzales. (Politiski, Richard) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/21 11:50 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Ruben Paul Gonzales. (Politiski, Richard) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/21 11:47 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Ruben Paul Gonzales. (Politiski, Richard) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 11:44 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19548789 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Ruben Paul Gonzales. (Attorney Richard James Politiski added to party Ruben Paul Gonzales(pty:pla))(Politiski, Richard) |