Fidel Rodriguez v. Ramos Tires Auto Repair et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Josephine L Staton |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00506 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 1:34 AM PDT |
Defendant
Rafael C. Ramos
|
|
Defendant
Yolanda Ramos
|
|
Defendant
Ramos Tires Auto Repair
|
|
Plaintiff
Fidel Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 04/07 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Fidel Rodriguez. (Politiski, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Wed 03/29 1:35 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),15 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),16 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),17 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (dv) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 03/28 3:06 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Fidel Rodriguez, upon Defendant Yolanda Ramos served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David, the person in charge of the business, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Politiski, Richard) |
|
16 | 16
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 03/28 3:00 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Fidel Rodriguez, upon Defendant Rafael C. Ramos served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David, the person in charge of the business, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Politiski, Richard) |
|
15 | 15
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 03/28 2:55 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Fidel Rodriguez, upon Defendant Ramos Tires Auto Repair served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David, the manager of the business, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons returned. (Politiski, Richard) |
|
14 | 14
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 03/28 2:38 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Fidel Rodriguez, notice to parties: ADA disability access litigation; application for stay; proposed order, served on 3 27-2017 (Politiski, Richard) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
adr
Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)
Fri 03/24 9:39 AM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (tg) |
|
12 | 12
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/24 9:38 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 2:35 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Yolanda Ramos. (et) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 2:34 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Rafael C. Ramos. (et) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 2:32 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Ramos Tires Auto Repair. (et) |
|
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 2:26 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 2:25 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/21 1:05 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Fidel Rodriguez, (Politiski, Richard) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/21 1:02 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Fidel Rodriguez. (Politiski, Richard) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/21 12:55 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Fidel Rodriguez. (Politiski, Richard) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/21 12:53 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Fidel Rodriguez. (Politiski, Richard) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/21 12:50 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Fidel Rodriguez. (Politiski, Richard) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 12:47 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19549586 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Fidel Rodriguez. (Attorney Richard James Politiski added to party Fidel Rodriguez(pty:pla))(Politiski, Richard) |