(HC) Randolph v. Matevousian
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lawrence J O'Neill |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00397 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 10, 2018 |
Petitioner
Devonne Randolph
|
|
Respondent
Matevousian
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
order
Judgment
Tue 07/10 11:57 AM
JUDGMENT dated *7/10/18* pursuant to order (Martin-Gill, S) |
|
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 07/10 11:56 AM
ORDER ADOPTING23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and to Decline to Issue a Certificate of Appealability re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 07/10/18. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 07/10 11:57 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:27 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations and28 Judgment served on Devonne Randolph. (Martin-Gill, S) |
||
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
respoth
Objections to Findings and Recommendations
Tue 06/26 8:08 AM
OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS23 by Petitioner Devonne Randolph. (Marrujo, C) |
|
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion for Extension
Fri 05/25 2:04 PM
ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Update Address24 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/25/2018. (Hellings, J) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Fri 05/25 2:05 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:25 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings, Order on Motion for Extension served on Devonne Randolph. (Hellings, J) |
||
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 05/24 2:16 PM
MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File Objections to23 Findings and Recommendations, by Devonne Randolph. (Gonzalez, R) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Tue 04/24 10:22 AM
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Motion for Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/23/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 04/24 10:23 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:23 Findings and Recommendations (Motion) served on Devonne Randolph. (Marrujo, C) |
||
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Reply
Thu 09/21 12:20 PM
REPLY by Devonne Randolph re18 Answer to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Marrujo, C) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 09/21 12:19 PM
MOTION for Discovery and Brief In Support of Rule 6 Discovery by Devonne Randolph. (Marrujo, C) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order
Wed 08/16 2:48 PM
ORDER Granting Respondent's19 Motion for Extension of Time Nunc Pro Tunc signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 08/16/2017. (Flores, E) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Wed 08/16 2:48 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:20 Order served on Devonne Randolph. (Flores, E) |
||
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Proposed Order
Tue 08/15 11:09 AM
PROPOSED ORDER re One-Day Extension re17 Order on Motion for Extension by Matevousian. (Escobar, Karen) |
|
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 08/15 11:07 AM
ANSWER to PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Matevousian.(Escobar, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibits A through F | ||
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension
Mon 07/24 2:30 PM
ORDER GRANTING Respondent's First15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 07/24/17.Case Management Deadline: 21-Day Deadline(Martin-Gill, S) |
|
16 | 16
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 07/24 10:26 AM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Matevousian re15 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to. (Escobar, Karen) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Mon 07/24 2:31 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:17 Order on Motion for Extension served on Devonne Randolph. (Martin-Gill, S) |
||
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Proposed Order
Wed 07/19 6:36 PM
PROPOSED ORDER re Extension of Time re10 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition by Matevousian. (Escobar, Karen) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 06/14 8:10 AM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Matevousian re13 Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge,12 Designation of Counsel. (Escobar, Karen) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Wed 06/14 8:09 AM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Matevousian. Attorney Escobar, Karen Ann added. (Escobar, Karen) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Designation of Counsel
Wed 06/14 8:08 AM
DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. (Escobar, Karen) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
09 - Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment
Tue 06/06 8:42 AM
RESPONDENT'S ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/6/2017. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
10 | 10
order
06 - HC/Order Requiring Respondent to File a Response
Tue 06/06 8:41 AM
ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition; ORDER SETTING Briefing Schedule; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Serve Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/5/2017. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 06/06 8:38 AM
ORDER WITHDRAWING7 Findings and Recommendations Recommending Dismissal of the Petition for Failure to State a Claim signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/5/2017. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 06/06 8:42 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:10 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition,9 Order, served on Devonne Randolph. (Sant Agata, S) |
||
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respoth
Objections to Findings and Recommendations
Fri 05/26 11:34 AM
OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS7 , by Petitioner Devonne Randolph. (Hellings, J) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Tue 04/25 9:21 AM
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Dismiss1 Petition for Lack of Habeas Jurisdiction signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/24/2017. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 5/30/2017. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 04/25 9:21 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:7 Findings and Recommendations (Motion) served on Devonne Randolph. (Sant Agata, S) |
||
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 04/18 10:49 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE (Text Only): This case has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and U.S. Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto; the new case number is 1:17-cv-00397-LJO-SKO(HC). (Sant Agata, S) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 04/18 10:50 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Docket Annotation served on Devonne Randolph. (Sant Agata, S) |
||
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/18 10:46 AM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Devonne Randolph. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 04/18 10:44 AM
NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to U.S.P. Lewisburg, PO Box 1000, Lewisburg, PA 17837 by Devonne Randolph. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
05 - HC/Order Authorizing IFP
Wed 03/22 10:08 AM
ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Devonne Randolph signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/22/17. (Hellings, J) |
|
2 | 2
order
Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider
Wed 03/22 10:06 AM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/24/2017. (Hellings, J) |
|
Att: 1 Order re Consent | ||
service
Service by Mail
Wed 03/22 10:09 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider,3 Order Authorizing IFP Status served on Devonne Randolph. (Hellings, J) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 03/21 12:41 PM
(2241) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Matevousian, by Devonne Randolph.(Hellings, J) |