United States of America v. Pappace
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Dale A Drozd |
Referred: | Barbara A Mcauliffe |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00406 |
Nature of Suit | 870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant) |
Cause | 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 2:28 AM PDT |
Petitioner
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Michael A Pappace
2573 E. Plymouth Way
Fresno, CA 93720 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 05/06 2:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): On May 3, 2019, Plaintiff filed a notice of voluntary dismissal of this action without prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. (Doc. No.14 .) In light of Plaintiff's voluntary dismissal, this action is terminated by operation of law without further order from the Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). This Court VACATES all pending dates and matters, if any. The case shall remain CLOSED. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/6/2019. (Valdez, E) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Mon 05/06 2:40 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL: 17 Minute Order, served on Michael A Pappace. (Valdez, E) |
||
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 05/03 8:49 AM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America re14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,15 Proposed Order. (Kennedy, Colleen) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Proposed Order
Fri 05/03 8:46 AM
PROPOSED ORDER re Dismissal re14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by United States of America. (Kennedy, Colleen) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 05/03 8:42 AM
NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by United States of America. Attorney Kennedy, Colleen M. added. (Kennedy, Colleen) |
|
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Designation of Counsel
Wed 06/27 3:50 PM
DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney John Richard Edwards for United States of America, attorney Kelli L. Taylor and Kelli L. Taylor, GOVT terminated(Edwards, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 12/29 12:19 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America re11 Designation of Counsel. Attorney Taylor, Kelli L. added. (Taylor, Kelli) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Designation of Counsel
Thu 12/28 2:12 PM
DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Kelli L. Taylor for United States of America, attorney Bobbie J. Montoya, cv terminated (Taylor, Kelli) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Thu 09/07 9:11 AM
ORDER ADOPTING8 Findings and Recommendations, Enforcing IRS Summons and Directing Respondent to Appear at IRS Offices, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/6/17. (Marrujo, C) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Thu 09/07 9:14 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:10 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, served on Michael A Pappace. (Marrujo, C) |
||
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Order
Wed 07/19 10:09 AM
PROPOSED ORDER re Order Enforcing Internal Revenue Summons re8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that re1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America. referred to Judge Drozd; by United States of America. (Montoya, Bobbie) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Mon 06/26 9:43 AM
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER re:1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/23/17. 14-Day Deadline. Referred to Judge Drozd. (Gonzalez, R) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Mon 06/26 9:43 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:8 Findings and Recommendations (Motion) served on Michael A Pappace. (Gonzalez, R) |
||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Proposed Order
Thu 06/22 3:15 PM
PROPOSED ORDER re Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations RE: Tax Summons Enforcement re 6 Show Cause Hearing,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, by United States of America. (Montoya, Bobbie) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
minutes
Show Cause Hearing ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 06/16 10:48 AM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/16/2017: SHOW CAUSE HEARING held. Order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel Bobbie Montoya - present. Defendant Pro Se Michael A. Pappace - present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO - Jami Thorp. (Herman, H) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 05/16 3:13 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America re1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons,4 Order to Show Cause,,. (Montoya, Bobbie) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 03/29 4:38 PM
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE re: Tax Summons Enforcement: SHOW CAUSE HEARING set for Friday, June 16, 2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The respondent may notify the Court, in a writing filed with the Clerk and served on the United States Attorney at least 10 days before the date set for the show cause hearing, that the respondent has no objections to enforcement of the summons. The respondents appearance at the hearing will then be excused. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/29/2017. (Herman, H) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Order
Wed 03/22 5:02 PM
PROPOSED ORDER re to Show Cause RE: Tax Summons Enforcement re1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons by United States of America.(Montoya, Bobbie) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/21 2:16 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NEW Motion to Enforce IRS Summons (TEXT ONLY). (Flores, E) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Tue 03/21 9:38 AM
PETITION to ENFORCE IRS SUMMONS by United States of America. Attorney Montoya, Bobbie J. added.(Montoya, Bobbie) |
|
Att: 1 Verification of Revenue Officer Lisa Lopez, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |