Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC v. Nordstrom et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John A Mendez |
Referred: | Kendall J Newman |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00594 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 23, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 2:14 AM PDT |
Defendant
Innovation Wealth Management
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Nordstrom
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 05/23 10:24 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/22/17 ORDERING Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (a)(1)(A)(ii) and (a)(2), the complaint filed in the captioned action by Fidelity against Defendants is DISMISSED with prejudice; No award of attorneys' fees or costs, or of expert fees or costs, is or shall be made in favor of any party; and the Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement entered into between Fidelity and Defendants, and to resolve any disputes relating to, or arising under, the Settlement Agreement. CASE CLOSED (Becknal, R) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Stipulation
Mon 05/22 4:10 PM
STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT, WITH PREJUDICE by Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC.(Huerta, Nina) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order On Joint Stipulation And Request For Dismissal Of complaint, With Prejudice, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
34 | 34
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 05/22 3:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The court has been advised by counsel for the parties, that this action has been settled, Therefore, it is not necessary that the action remain upon the court's active calendar. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED: 1. That counsel file settlement/dismissal documents, in accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 160, no later than June 23, 2017; and 2. That any hearing dates previously set in this matter are vacated.(TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H) |
|
33 | 33
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 05/22 3:21 PM
NOTICE of SETTLEMENT JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND STIPULATION TO VACATE ALL CASE DEADLINES by Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC. (Huerta, Nina) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
3
pgs
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 04/06 8:11 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/5/2017 ORDERING the defendants to respond to the1 Complaint within 30 days after a final decision is entered by the FINRA Arbitration Panel. (Michel, G.) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
4
pgs
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 04/04 3:49 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint by Innovation Wealth Management, John Nordstrom. Attorney Collanton, Valerie Elise added.(Collanton, Valerie) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
30 | 30
2
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/04 9:33 AM
NOTICE of Defendant Innovation Wealth Management's Consent to Arbitration Before FINRA by Innovation Wealth Management. Attorney Collanton, Valerie Elise added.(Collanton, Valerie) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
6
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/03 2:39 PM
NOTICE OF POSTING OF INJUNCTION BOND PURSUANT TO ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (ECF 26) by Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC re26 Order, Order on Motion for TRO.(Huerta, Nina) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
2
pgs
respm
Declaration
Fri 03/31 12:18 PM
DECLARATION of John Nordstrom in re5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Wiseman, Dylan) |
|
27 | 27
2
pgs
respm
Declaration
Fri 03/31 12:16 PM
DECLARATION of Innovation Wealth Management in re5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order.(Wiseman, Dylan) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
5
pgs
order
Order Order on Motion for TRO
Thu 03/30 3:32 PM
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/30/2017 GRANTING5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Donati, J) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 03/29 12:56 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC re23 Notice of Filing / Lodging Document in Paper. (Huerta, Nina) |
|
24 | 24
11
pgs
misc
Reply
Wed 03/29 11:34 AM
REPLY by Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC re5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order.(Huerta, Nina) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Jennifer Kenedy, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of David Taylor, | ||
Att: 3 Response to Defendants' Evidentiary Objections To Declarations, | ||
Att: 4 Notice of Lodging, | ||
Att: 5 Proof of Service | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Filing / Lodging Document in Paper
Wed 03/29 10:54 AM
NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENT IN PAPER by Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC: CD Containing A Recorded Voicemail. (Huerta, Nina) |
|
22 | 22
order
Pro Hac Vice Order
Wed 03/29 10:22 AM
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/28/17: Added attorney Jennifer A. Kenedy, PHV for Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC. (Kaminski, H) |
|
misc
Acknowledgement of Receipt
Wed 03/29 11:51 AM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of CD from Nina Huerta re Notice of Lodging23 . [ROUTED TO CHAMBERS] (Mena-Sanchez, L) |
||
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order
Tue 03/28 11:48 AM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC for attorney Jennifer A. Kenedy to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-6984969)(Huerta, Nina) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
24
pgs
respm
Opposition to Motion
Mon 03/27 12:10 PM
OPPOSITION by Innovation Wealth Management, John Nordstrom to5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Attorney Wiseman, Dylan W. added.(Wiseman, Dylan) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of John Nordstrom in Opposition, | ||
Att: 2 Evidentiary Objections, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 3 pgs Proof of Service | ||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
5
pgs
order
Protective Order
Fri 03/24 10:40 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/23/2017. (Zignago, K.) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/23 9:58 AM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC re17 Stipulation and Proposed Order,12 Summons Returned Executed,14 Declaration,11 Summons Returned Executed,13 Declaration,16 Certificate of Service. (Huerta, Nina) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
5
pgs
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 03/22 4:09 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Corrected Stipulated Protective Order re15 Stipulation and Proposed Order by Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC. (Huerta, Nina) |
|
16 | 16
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 03/22 3:39 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC re9 Order,7 Notice of Request to Seal Document(s),6 Ex Parte Application,5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,8 Order,. (Huerta, Nina) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 03/22 3:33 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Stipulated Protective Order by Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC. (Huerta, Nina) |
|
14 | 14
respm
Declaration
Wed 03/22 2:36 PM
DECLARATION of DAVID TAYLOR in SUPPORT OF5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Huerta, Nina) |
|
13 | 13
respm
Declaration
Wed 03/22 2:31 PM
DECLARATION of Kristina M. Koch in SUPPORT OF5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Huerta, Nina) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 03/22 2:27 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Innovation Wealth Management served on 3/21/2017, answer due 4/11/2017. (Huerta, Nina) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 03/22 2:21 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: John Nordstrom served on 3/21/2017, answer due 4/11/2017. (Huerta, Nina) |
|
10 | 10
order
Minute Order
Wed 03/22 1:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs request to file certain exhibits under seal was denied by the Court. ECF No. 9. Plaintiff is ordered to serve all exhibits on Defendants counsel by 5:00 p.m. today (March 22, 2017). Defendants opposition to the Motion for a TRO is due no later than 2:00 p.m. on Monday, March 27, 2017. The opposition may not exceed 35 pages. Plaintiffs reply to the opposition is due no later 12:00 noon on Wednesday, March 29, 2017. The reply may not exceed 10 pages. IT IS SO ORDERED. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order
Wed 03/22 11:09 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/22/2017 DENYING Ex Parte Request to Seal Documents re7 Notice of Request to Seal Documents. (Michel, G.) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/22 8:36 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/22/2017 GRANTING6 Ex Parte Application; GRANTING the plaintiff leave to file its 35-page memorandum in support of5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; PERMITTING the defendants to file a brief up to 35 pages if they elect to oppose said motion; ORDERING that all other briefs comply with the Court's page limitations. (Michel, G.) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
3
pgs
notice
Notice of Request to Seal Document(s)
Tue 03/21 4:37 PM
NOTICE OF REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENTS pursuant to L.R. 141 by Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC. (Huerta, Nina) |
|
6 | 6
3
pgs
misc
Ex Parte Application
Tue 03/21 4:34 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File an Oversized Brief in support of5 Motion for Temporary REstraining Order by Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC. (Huerta, Nina) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
8
pgs
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Tue 03/21 4:31 PM
MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC.(Huerta, Nina) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorites, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of David Taylor, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Robert Heisler, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration of Kristina M. Koch, | ||
Att: 6 Declaration of Nina Huerta, | ||
Att: 7 TRO Checklist | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
misc
Civil New Case Documents for JAM
Tue 03/21 8:21 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Washington, S) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 Order re Filing Requirements, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
service
Summons
Tue 03/21 8:20 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Innovation Wealth Management, John Nordstrom* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nina Huerta* *Locke Lord LLP* *300 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2600* *Los Angeles, CA 90071*. (Washington, S) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 2 pgs STATEMENT of Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure by Plaintiff Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC. (Huerta, Nina) | |
1 | 1 22 pgs COMPLAINT and Injunctive Relief against Innovation Wealth Management, John Nordstrom by Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6970943)(Huerta, Nina) Modified on 3/20/2017 (Washington, S). | |
Att: 1 Exhibits 1-6, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |