(PC)Weaver v. Thoe
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Morrison C England, Jr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00598 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 05, 2017 |
Defendant
Thoe
|
|
Plaintiff
Willie Weaver
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment
Mon 06/05 9:20 AM
JUDGMENT dated *6/5/17* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/2/17. (Kaminski, H) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Mon 06/05 9:20 AM
ORDER adopting6 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/2/17: This action is dismissed without prejudice. (Kaminski, H) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Mon 06/05 9:21 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:7 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations,8 Judgment, served on Willie Weaver. (Kaminski, H) |
||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Tue 05/02 2:30 PM
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/2/2017 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 05/02 2:31 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:6 Findings and Recommendations served on Willie Weaver. (Yin, K) |
||
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/11 3:11 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE (text only): Pursuant to the4 Decline to Jurisdiction of U.S. Magistrate Judge filed, this case has been randomly assigned to U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney remains the Magistrate Judge assigned. The case number on all future filings shall be: 2:17-cv-0598 MCE CKD (PC). (Benson, A) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 04/11 3:11 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL: (#5) Clerk's Notice served on Willie Weaver. (Benson, A) |
||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/10 11:53 AM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Willie Weaver. (Benson, A) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Thu 03/23 10:26 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/22/2017 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the filing fee in the amount of $400.00. The Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application.(Yin, K) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Thu 03/23 10:27 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Order ifp application served on Willie Weaver. (Yin, K) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider
Tue 03/21 2:57 PM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/24/2017 (Mena-Sanchez, L) |
|
Att: 1 Order re Consent | ||
service
Service by Mail
Tue 03/21 2:58 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Willie Weaver. (Mena-Sanchez, L) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint
Tue 03/21 12:28 PM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Thoe by Willie Weaver.(Mena-Sanchez, L) |