United States of America v. Insight Environmental, Engineering and Construction, Inc.
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Anthony J Battaglia |
Referred: | Andrew G Schopler |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00550 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1345 U.S. Plaintiff |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 2:14 AM PDT |
Petitioner
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Insight Environmental, Engineering and Construction, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 05/09 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United States of America(Keehn, Douglas)(acc) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 04/20 11:08 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Insight Environmental, Engineering and Construction, Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Respondent will have through and including 5/19/2017, to file a response to the Petition. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/20/2017. (acc) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Declaration
Wed 04/19 4:16 PM
DECLARATION re4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Respondent Insight Environmental, Engineering and Construction, Inc.. (Worley, Kirsten) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 04/19 3:12 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Insight Environmental, Engineering and Construction, Inc..(Worley, Kirsten)Attorney Kirsten A. Worley added to party Insight Environmental, Engineering and Construction, Inc. (pty:res) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/03 1:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Insight Environmental, Engineering and Construction, Inc. served. (Keehn, Douglas)(acc) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/29 12:58 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dsn) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition
Tue 03/21 8:53 AM
PETITION For Summary Enforcement of Inspector General Subpoena against Insight Environmental, Engineering and Construction, Inc., Fee Waived, filed by United States of America. The new case number is 3:17-cv-550-AJB-AGS. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Keehn, Douglas)(dsn) (jao) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit |