Celaya v. Superior Court of California
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | John A Houston |
Referred: | Bernard G Skomal |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00552 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 03, 2018 |
Petitioner
Marco Celaya
|
|
Respondent
Superior Court of California
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 01, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 04/01 1:17 PM
ORDER of USCA as to16 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Marco Celaya. The request for a certificate of appealability is denied because appellant has not shown that "jurists of reason would find it debatable whether the petition states a valid claim of the denial of a constitutional right and that jurists of reason would find it debatable whether the district court was correct in its procedural ruling." Any pending motions are denied as moot. Denied. (akr) |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Withdrawal of Document
Tue 08/28 11:17 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Marco Celaya re18 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis Pro Se filed by Marco Celaya .(Codner, Michael). (akr) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
18 | 18
motion
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Tue 08/28 10:46 AM
***WITHDRAWN BY THE FILER PER19 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT***: MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis Pro Se by Marco Celaya.(Codner, Michael). (akr). (Modified on 8/28/2018: Per19 Notice of Withdrawal of Document, the motion, which is captioned to the US Court of Appeals, has been withdrawn by the filer. The filer will forward the filing to the US Court of Appeals.) (akr) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 08/06 10:28 AM
USCA Case Number 18-56055 for16 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Marco Celaya. (akr) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit
Fri 08/03 6:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit as to15 Order, by Marco Celaya., IFP Filed (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals.)(Codner, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Michael J. Codner, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
8
pgs
order
Order
Fri 07/06 9:03 AM
AMENDED ORDER overruling Petitioner's objections; adopting11 the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation; granting 6 Respondent's motion to dismiss; and dismissing Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus as untimely; and denying certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 7/05/2018.(jpp) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment - Clerk
Tue 07/03 11:42 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Petitioner's objections are overruled. The Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation is adopted.Respondent's motion to dismiss the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is granted.(jpp) |
|
13 | 13
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Report and Recommendation
Tue 07/03 11:34 AM
ORDER overruling Petitioner's objections; adopting11 the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation; granting6 Respondent's motion to dismiss; and dismissing Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus as untimely. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 7/03/2018. (jpp) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Objection to Report and Recommendation
Wed 03/14 3:58 PM
Objection to Report and Recommendation re11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re6 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Superior Court of California filed by Marco Celaya.(Codner, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Report and Recommendation
Thu 03/01 8:27 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re6 MOTION to Dismiss. Objections to R&R due by 3/15/2018. Replies due by 3/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 2/28/2018.(jpp) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 08/15 8:32 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Marco Celaya.(Codner, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 07/18 10:21 AM
ORDER granting8 unopposed Motion to continue Petitioner's deadline to file opposition to Respondent's motion to dismiss and setting reply deadline. Petitioner must file his Opposition, if any, to the motion no later than 8/16/2017. Respondent shall file a Reply to Petitioners Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss on or before 9/01/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/18/2017. (jpp) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File
Thu 07/13 6:21 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Marco Celaya.(Codner, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Lodgment of State Court Record
Tue 06/06 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Lodgment of State Court Record by Superior Court of California re6 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (LaPietra, Vincent) |
|
Att: 1 Lod 1, | ||
Att: 2 Lod 2, | ||
Att: 3 Lod 3, | ||
Att: 4 Lod 4, | ||
Att: 5 Lod 5, | ||
Att: 6 Lod 6, | ||
Att: 7 Lod 7, | ||
Att: 8 Lod 8, | ||
Att: 9 Lod 9, | ||
Att: 10 Lod 10 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Tue 06/06 11:34 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Superior Court of California.(LaPietra, Vincent) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus | ||
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/11 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Paul LaPietra on behalf of Superior Court of California (LaPietra, Vincent)Attorney Vincent Paul LaPietra added to party Superior Court of California(pty:res) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Supplemental Document
Mon 04/03 2:09 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Marco Celaya re3 Notice of Appearance Proof of Service . (Codner, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/03 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Codner on behalf of Marco Celaya (Codner, Michael) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order Setting Briefing Schedule - Habeas Corpus
Tue 03/28 4:43 PM
ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION: Respondent must file a "Notice of Appearance" no later than 4/17/2017. Motion to Dismiss due 6/9/2017, Opposition to Motion due 7/17/2017. OR Answer by Respondent due 6/9/2017, Traverse by Petitioner due 7/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 3/27/2017. (The Petition and this Order were electronically served on Calif. Atty Gen.) (mdc) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 03/21 9:56 AM
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Superior Court of California ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0974-9914268), filed by Marco Celaya. The new case number is 3:17-cv-00552-JAH-BGS. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Codner, Michael)(nbp) (jao) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Memo of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix, | ||
Att: 4 Proof of Service |