P.I.C. International Inc. et al v. MiFlex 2 Spa et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cathy Ann Bencivengo |
Referred: | William V Gallo |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00556 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:0271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 02, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 1:23 AM PDT |
Defendant
Mauro Mazzo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Li Chung Plastics Industry Co., LTD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
P.I.C. International Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
MiFlex 2 Spa
Terminated: 08/17/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
utility
Report Regarding Patent & Trademark Closing
Tue 10/31 2:18 PM
REPORT of Patent and Trademark Closing, regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 8,381,772, re17 and19 ORDERs on Defendants Motion to Dismiss. cc:USPTO (mxn) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Wed 09/20 3:50 PM
ORDER on Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration [Doc. No.21 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/20/2017. (jjg) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Reconsideration
Wed 09/13 8:25 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re19 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by Li Chung Plastics Industry Co., LTD, P.I.C. International Inc..(Coddington, Trevor) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Trevor Coddington, | ||
Att: 3 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Reconsideration
Tue 09/12 9:46 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re19 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by Li Chung Plastics Industry Co., LTD, P.I.C. International Inc..(Coddington, Trevor) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Coddington, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 09/07 3:27 PM
ORDER on Defendant Mauro Mazzo's Motion to Dismiss and Request for Sanctions [Doc. No.16 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/7/2017. (jjg) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Reply - Other
Tue 09/05 12:49 PM
REPLY - Other re16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Mauro Mazzo.(Lapple, Matthew) (jjg) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 08/18 9:10 AM
ORDER on Defendant MiFlex 2 S.P.A's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. no.12 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/17/2017. (jjg) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Tue 08/08 6:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Mauro Mazzo.(Lapple, Matthew)Attorney Matthew C Lapple added to party Mauro Mazzo(pty:dft) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Mauro Mazzo, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Mauro Mazzo, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Mauro Mazzo, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration of Matthew Lapple, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit A to Declaration of Matthew Lapple, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit B to Declaration of Matthew Lapple, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit C to Declaration of Matthew Lapple, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit D to Declaration of Matthew Lapple, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit E to Declaration of Matthew Lapple, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit F to Declaration of Matthew Lapple, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit G to Declaration of Matthew Lapple, | ||
Att: 13 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 06/23 10:28 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MiFlex 2 Spa re14 Reply to Response to Motion (Lapple, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 06/22 12:44 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by MiFlex 2 Spa. (Lapple, Matthew) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 06/16 6:12 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Li Chung Plastics Industry Co., LTD, P.I.C. International Inc..(Coddington, Trevor) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Facts Contested, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Trevor Coddington, | ||
Att: 3 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 05/26 10:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by MiFlex 2 Spa.(Lapple, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Mauro Mazzo in Support of Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit #1 to Mazzo Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit #2 to Mazzo Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit #3 to Mazzo Declaration, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit #4 to Mazzo Declaration, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit #5 to Mazzo Declaration, | ||
Att: 8 Notice of Party with Financial Interest, | ||
Att: 9 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Party With Financial Interest
Thu 05/11 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Li Chung Plastics Industry Co., LTD, P.I.C. International Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest.(Coddington, Trevor) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 05/11 3:29 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by P.I.C. International Inc., Li Chung Plastics Industry Co., LTD, as to Mauro Mazzo. (Coddington, Trevor) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/10 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James V Fazio, III on behalf of Li Chung Plastics Industry Co., LTD, P.I.C. International Inc. (Fazio, James)Attorney James V Fazio, III added to party Li Chung Plastics Industry Co., LTD(pty:pla), Attorney James V Fazio, III added to party P.I.C. International Inc. (pty:pla) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/09 6:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Beckwith on behalf of Li Chung Plastics Industry Co., LTD, P.I.C. International Inc.(Beckwith, David)Attorney David Michael Beckwith added to party Li Chung Plastics Industry Co., LTD(pty:pla), Attorney David Michael Beckwith added to party P.I.C. International Inc. (pty:pla) (jjg) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 05/02 12:31 PM
ORDER on Motion by Defendant MiFlex 2 Spa to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by 30 Days [Doc. No.6 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 5/2/2017. (jjg) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 04/26 7:37 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by MiFlex 2 Spa.(Lapple, Matthew)Attorney Matthew C Lapple added to party MiFlex 2 Spa (pty:dft) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Extend Time for MiFlex 2 SPA to Respond to Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Matthew C. Lapple in Support of Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Matthew C. Lapple, | ||
Att: 4 Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/25 6:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by P.I.C. International Inc., Li Chung Plastics Industry Co., LTD. MiFlex 2 Spa served.(Coddington, Trevor) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order of Judge Transfer
Thu 03/23 9:04 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Judge John A. Houston has declined assignment pursuant to General Order 598. Case reassigned to Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo for all further proceedings. The new case number is 17cv556 CAB (WVG).(no document attached) (jcj) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
utility
Report Regarding Patent & Trademark FORM
Tue 03/21 2:19 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *8,381,772* cc:USPTO (dsn) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/21 2:18 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dsn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/21 2:16 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-9916891.), filed by P.I.C. International Inc., Li Chung Plastics Industry Co., LTD. The new case number is 3:17-cv-556-JAH-WVG. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Coddington, Trevor)(dsn)(sjt) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 |