Balanzar v. Financial Credit Network, Inc.
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Marilyn L Huff |
Referred: | Bernard G Skomal |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00558 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 47:0227 FCC-Unsolicited Telephone Sales |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 1:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
Financial Credit Network, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emir Balanzar
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 06/22 11:56 AM
ORDER Granting Parties'14 Joint Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 6/22/2017. (ag) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss
Fri 06/09 12:29 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. Rule Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A) by Emir Balanzar.(Wood, Alexis) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/09 10:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David E Castro on behalf of Financial Credit Network, Inc. (Castro, David)Attorney David E Castro added to party Financial Credit Network, Inc. (pty:dft) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
minutes
Case Management Conference Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 05/31 6:01 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal: Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference held on 5/31/2017. The Court continues the ENE/CMC to 6/30/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. The parties are authorized to conduct the informal discovery discussed during the ENE. Continued ENE/CMC shall be attorneys-only and telephonic. Plaintiff's counsel shall coordinate a joint call to Judge Skomal's chambers on June 30, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. (Plaintiff Attorneys Alexis Wood, Kas Galucci). (Defendant Attorney David Castro). (no document attached) (rxa) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)
Wed 05/24 10:19 AM
ORDER Granting10 Joint Motion for Telephonic Attorneys-Only Early Neutral Evaluation. The Early Neutral Evaluation scheduled for 5/31/2017 will be held telephonically with attorneys only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 5/24/2017. (ag) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Miscellaneous (Other 1)
Mon 05/22 4:02 PM
Joint MOTION Motion for Telephonic Attorneys-Only ENE Conference by Emir Balanzar.(Wood, Alexis) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Joint Discovery Plan
Fri 05/19 3:08 PM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Emir Balanzar(Wood, Alexis) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order for Early Neutral Evaluation
Mon 05/01 1:25 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 5/31/2017 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. In the event the case does not settle at the ENE, a Case Management Conference, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) will be held at the conclusion of the settlement conference. A Joint Discovery Plan is due 5/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 5/1/2017.(ag) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/26 12:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emir Balanzar. Financial Credit Network, Inc. served. (Marron, Ronald) (ag) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/14 2:40 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Financial Credit Network, Inc..(Ellis, Mark)Attorney Mark E Ellis added to party Financial Credit Network, Inc. (pty:dft) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/24 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kas L. Gallucci on behalf of Emir Balanzar(Gallucci, Kas)Attorney Kas L. Gallucci added to party Emir Balanzar(pty:pla) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/24 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis M. Wood on behalf of Emir Balanzar(Wood, Alexis)Attorney Alexis M. Wood added to party Emir Balanzar(pty:pla) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/24 7:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. Shay on behalf of Emir Balanzar(Shay, Daniel)Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Emir Balanzar(pty:pla) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/21 3:30 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dsn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/21 3:29 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Financial Credit Network, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-9917717.), filed by Emir Balanzar. The new case number is 3:17-cv-558-H-BGS. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Marron, Ronald)(dsn) (sjt) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |