Weldon v. Ekongkaar, Inc.
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Wallace Capel, Jr |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00160 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12181Americans with Disabilities Act-Public Accommodations Private |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 09, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 4:02 AM CDT |
Defendant
Ekongkaar, Inc.
a foreign corporation c/o Vikram Chaudhary 1785 East Park Place Blvd Suite 209
Stone Mountain, GA 30087 |
|
Plaintiff
Dallas Weldon
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 11/09 2:12 PM
Clerk's NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. This case has been closed and removed from the docket of this court. (dmn, ) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 11/03 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dallas Weldon (Fulmer, John) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Fri 09/22 10:20 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ekongkaar, Inc. (dmn, ) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Thu 09/21 10:26 AM
19 Application for Entry of Default hand delivered to Clerk of Court. (dmn, ) (NO PDF) |
||
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default
Wed 09/20 2:56 PM
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default by Dallas Weldon against Ekongkaar, Inc..(Fulmer, John) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Application for Entry of Default, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 09/20 1:51 PM
NOTICE by Dallas Weldon Status Report (Fulmer, John) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Docket Annotation
Thu 09/14 1:40 PM
Return receipt card showing service of16 Order signed by N. N. Patel for Ekongkaar, Inc. served 9/12/2017. (dmn, ) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 09/07 3:58 PM
ORDER: On 7/27/2017, the undersigned entered an Order (Doc. 15 ) granting Plaintiffs unopposed second motion for an extension of time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint. The Order gave Defendant until 8/9/2017, to file his answer or respond. To date, Defendant has not filed an answer or responsive pleading as set forth in the undersigneds Order, nor has Plaintiff filed for default judgment against Defendant. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that, on or before 9/21/2017, Plaintiff is to file a status reportupdating the court as to his intentions of pursuing this case. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/7/2017. Copy mailed CMRRR to Plaintiff. (dmn, ) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 07/27 11:23 AM
ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs unopposed Second Motion to Extend Time (Doc. 14 ), it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. On or before 8/9/2017, Defendant may answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 7/27/2017. (dmn, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 07/26 4:23 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer UNOPPOSED by Dallas Weldon. (Fulmer, John) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 06/26 1:11 PM
ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's 12 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. On or before 7/26/2017, Defendant may answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Answer due from Ekongkaar, Inc. on 7/26/2017. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 6/26/2017. (dmn, ) |
|
Sunday, June 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Sun 06/25 10:35 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer UNOPPOSED by Dallas Weldon. (Fulmer, John) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Return Receipt Card
Mon 06/05 1:31 PM
Return Receipt Card showing service of alias summons and complaint signed by N. Patel for Ekongkaar, Inc. served on 6/3/2017, answer due 6/26/2017. (dmn, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Alias Summons
Wed 05/31 10:13 AM
Alias Summons issued as to Ekongkaar, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of1 Complaint. (wcl, ) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Tue 05/09 8:46 AM
Alias Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Ekongkaar, Inc. by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Unclaimed, Unable to Forward." Counsel notified electronically by this docket entry. (dmn, ) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Alias Summons
Thu 04/27 11:34 AM
Alias Summons; alias summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Ekongkaar, Inc. (dmn, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/19 11:59 AM
ORDER that Plaintiff's2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 4/19/2017. (dmn, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Tue 04/11 9:58 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Dallas Weldon as to Ekongkaar, Inc. returned w/ the following USPS notation: "Return to Sender", "Unable to Forward", "Unable to Forward", "Return to Sender". Counsel for plaintiff notified via this e-notice that service has not been perfected. (kh, ) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge
Wed 03/22 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Dallas Weldon. (dmn, ) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 2:45 PM
Summons Issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Ekongkaar, Inc. (dmn, ) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/22 2:42 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Dallas Weldon. (dmn, ) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/22 2:41 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dallas Weldon.(dmn, ) |
|
Att: 1 Application to Proceed IFP | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 2:40 PM
COMPLAINT against Ekongkaar, Inc. filed by Dallas Weldon.(dmn, ) |