Ronkowski, Edward et al v. United States of America
Wisconsin Western District Court | |
Judge: | Barbara B Crabb |
Referred: | Stephen L Crocker |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00226 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:2409(a) Quiet Title Action |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 23, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 4:01 AM CDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joann Ronkowski
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, February 19, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
appeal
USCA Judgment
Tue 02/19 2:17 PM
JUDGMENT from USCA affirming district court with costs as to36 Notice of Appeal filed by Joann Ronkowski, Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr. Record returned. (jat) |
|
Att: 1 Mandate, | ||
Att: 2 Appellate Opinion | ||
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
appeal
Appeal Record Sent to USCA
Fri 11/16 10:28 AM
Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re:36 Notice of Appeal, (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Certification | ||
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
appeal
Court Reporter Certification of Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet
Thu 06/07 1:03 PM
Court Reporter Certification of Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet re36 Notice of Appeal. (jat) |
|
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 06/07 8:49 AM
USCA Case Number 18-2269 for36 Notice of Appeal filed by Joann Ronkowski, Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr. (jat) |
||
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
appeal
Transcript Request Form
Wed 06/06 4:07 PM
Transcript Request Form by Plaintiffs Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr, Joann Ronkowski re36 Notice of Appeal, (Mich, Robert) |
|
38 | 38
appeal
Transmission of Short Record to Seventh Circuit
Wed 06/06 3:45 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Docketing Statement, Opinion and Order, Judgment and Docket Sheet to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re:36 Notice of Appeal, (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Docketing Statement, | ||
Att: 2 Opinion and Order, | ||
Att: 3 Judgment, | ||
Att: 4 Docket Sheet | ||
37 | 37
appeal
Appeal Information Packet
Wed 06/06 3:41 PM
Appeal Information Packet. (lak) |
|
36 | 36
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 06/06 3:28 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiffs Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr, Joann Ronkowski as to34 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,35 Judgment. Filing fee of $ 505, receipt number 0758-2258539 paid. Docketing Statement filed. (Mich, Robert) Modified on 6/6/2018. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Docketing Statement | ||
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
order
Judgment
Wed 05/23 3:19 PM
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant United States of America dismissing the case. (jat) |
|
34 | 34
30+
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Wed 05/23 3:13 PM
OPINION AND ORDER denying11 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting20 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/23/18. (jat) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Reply in Support of Proposed Findings of Fact
Tue 02/13 5:52 PM
Reply in Support of Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendant United States of America re:20 Motion for Summary Judgment (Humphrey, Richard) |
|
32 | 32
respm
Declaration
Tue 02/13 5:51 PM
Declaration of Carter Deems filed by Defendant United States of America re:20 Motion for Summary Judgment (Humphrey, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Drummond Quad, 1947 Map, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Shaded Drummond Quad, 1971 Map, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Drummond Quad, 1971 Map, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Bayfield Co. Aerial Photograph, 1975, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Bayfield Co. Aerial Photograph, 1981 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Brief in Reply
Tue 02/13 5:30 PM
Brief in Reply by Defendant United States of America in Support of20 Motion for Summary Judgment (Humphrey, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Disclaimer of Interest | ||
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Affidavit
Fri 02/02 2:51 PM
Affidavit of Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr. filed by Plaintiffs Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr, Joann Ronkowski re:20 Motion for Summary Judgment,11 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Mich, Robert) Modified on 2/2/2018. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 105 - Portion of NFS Motor Vehicle Use Map, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 106 - Change Sheet for Motor Vehicle Use Map, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 107 - Relevant Portions of Bayfield County Snowmobile Map, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 108 - Drawing and Metes and Bounds Description dated 1-23-18 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Reply in Support of Proposed Findings of Fact
Fri 02/02 2:35 PM
Reply in Support of Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Plaintiffs Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr, Joann Ronkowski re:11 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Mich, Robert) Modified on 2/2/2018. (lak) |
|
28 | 28
respm
Proposed Findings of Fact
Fri 02/02 2:28 PM
Response to Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Plaintiffs Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr, Joann Ronkowski re:20 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Mich, Robert) Modified on 2/2/2018 (voc). Modified on 2/2/2018. (lak) |
|
27 | 27
respm
Brief in Reply
Fri 02/02 2:23 PM
Combined Brief in Reply by Plaintiffs Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr, Joann Ronkowski in Support of11 Motion for Summary Judgment and Brief in Opposition to20 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Mich, Robert) Modified on 2/2/2018. (lak) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Declaration
Tue 01/23 10:54 AM
Declaration of Randy R. Erickson filed by Defendant United States of America re:20 Motion for Summary Judgment (Humphrey, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Record of Decision | ||
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Exhibit
Thu 01/18 11:54 AM
Exhibit to15 Affidavit,,,, filed by Joann Ronkowski, Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr.,11 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Joann Ronkowski, Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr. Exhibit 96 - More Photographs of Trespassers (Mich, Robert) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Response to Proposed Findings of Fact
Fri 01/12 6:43 PM
Response to Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendant United States of America re:11 Motion for Summary Judgment (Humphrey, Richard) |
|
23 | 23
respm
Proposed Findings of Fact
Fri 01/12 6:40 PM
Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendant United States of America re:20 Motion for Summary Judgment (Humphrey, Richard) |
|
22 | 22
respm
Declaration
Fri 01/12 6:38 PM
Declaration of Randy R. Erickson filed by Defendant United States of America re:20 Motion for Summary Judgment (Humphrey, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Record of Decision | ||
21 | 21
respm
Brief in Support
Fri 01/12 6:34 PM
Brief in Support of20 Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant United States of America (Humphrey, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Map with Legend | ||
20 | 20
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 01/12 6:28 PM
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Defendant United States of America. Brief in Opposition due 2/2/2018. Brief in Reply due 2/12/2018. (Humphrey, Richard) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 12/19 3:53 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Motion for Summary Judgment. Brief in Opposition due 1/12/2018. Brief in Reply due 2/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/19/17. (jat) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 12/19 11:18 AM
Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant United States of America. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Humphrey, Richard) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Affidavit
Fri 12/01 3:59 PM
Affidavit of Attorney Robert A. Mich, Jr. filed by Plaintiffs Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr., Joann Ronkowski re:11 Motion for Summary Judgment, (Mich, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 103 - Plaintiffs' Discovery Request dated August 11, 2017, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 104 - Response to Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests dated Sept. 13, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Exhibit
Fri 12/01 3:56 PM
Exhibit to15 Affidavit, filed by Joann Ronkowski, Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr.,11 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Joann Ronkowski, Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr. Exhibits 96-102 to Affidavit of Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr., (Mich, Robert) Modified on 12/1/2017. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 97 - Incident Report Form, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 98 - Photographs of Trespassers, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 99 - More Photographs of Trespassers, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 100 - Photographs of Mr. Erickson, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 101 - Copy Depicting ATV Goggles, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 102 - Screenshot from Website Map | ||
15 | 15
respm
Affidavit
Fri 12/01 3:35 PM
Affidavit of Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr. filed by Plaintiffs Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr., Joann Ronkowski re:11 Motion for Summary Judgment, (Mich, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 81 - 1937 Map of Drummond Township, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 82 - 2004 ATV Trail Map, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 83 - Road Analysis Report For the Travel Management Plan Project, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 84 - Portions of Undated Travel Management Detail Map, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 85 - Decision Notice and Finding of No Significant Impact, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 86 - Public Comments and Agency Responses, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 87 - Photograph taken on August 7, 2017, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 88 - Photographs taken July, 2017, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 89 - Photograph taken on August 9, 2017, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 90 - Photograph taken on September 21, 2017, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 91 - Photograph taken on September 21, 2017, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 92 - Photograph taken on September 21, 2017, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 93 - No Hunting/No Motor Vehicles Sign, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 94 - No Hunting Sign, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 95 - No Hunting Sign | ||
14 | 14
respm
Affidavit
Fri 12/01 2:59 PM
Affidavit of Tracy P. Hetebrueg filed by Plaintiffs Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr., Joann Ronkowski re:11 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Mich, Robert) |
|
13 | 13
respm
Proposed Findings of Fact
Fri 12/01 2:57 PM
Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Plaintiffs Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr., Joann Ronkowski re:11 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Mich, Robert) |
|
12 | 12
respm
Brief in Support
Fri 12/01 2:54 PM
Brief in Support of11 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr., Joann Ronkowski, (Mich, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit - House v. Pasko, 329 Wis.2d 270 (2010) | ||
11 | 11
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 12/01 2:48 PM
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Plaintiffs Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr., Joann Ronkowski. Brief in Opposition due 12/22/2017. Brief in Reply due 1/2/2018. (Mich, Robert) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Exhibit
Mon 10/02 11:11 AM
Stipulation Regarding Authenticity of Exhibits filed by Joann Ronkowski, Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr., (Mich, Robert) Modified on 10/2/2017. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 71 - May 9, 2008 Easement from Eric Allen to Ronkowski, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 72 - Page from 1920 Bayfield County Plat Book, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 73 - September 4, 1938 Aerial Photo, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 74 - Aerial Photo of Plaintiff's Parcel and Surrounding Area, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 75 - 1906 Bayfield County Plat Book, Page 8, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 76 - 1918 Map of T.44N.R.8W., | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 77 - 2016 Motor Vehcle Use Map, Chiquamegon-Nicolet National Forest, Washburn District, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 78 - 1917 Map of T44N.R7W., by Surveyor John Forss, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 79 - Part 1 of 2 - John Forss's Survey Field Notes for T44N, R8W, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 79 - Part 2 of 2 - John Forss's Survey Field Notes for T44N, R8W, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 80 - Part 1 of 3 - John Forss's Survey Field Notes for T44N, R7W, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 80 - Part 2 of 3 - John Forss's Survey Field Notes for T44N, R7W, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 80 - Part 3 of 3 - John Forss's Survey Field Notes for T44N, R7W | ||
9 | 9
misc
Exhibit
Mon 10/02 10:52 AM
Stipulation Regarding Authenticity of Exhibits filed by Joann Ronkowski, Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr., (Mich, Robert) Modified on 10/2/2017. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 45 - April 21, 1931 Deed, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 46 - July 13, 1920 Land Contract, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 47 - March 25, 1920 Deed, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 48 - August 10, 1916 Deed, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 49 - August 21, 1931 Deed, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 50 - November 19, 1918 Deed, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 51 - November 8, 1944 Deed, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 52 - Patent Deed filed on November 7, 1919, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 53 - February 26, 1944 Quit Claim Deed, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 54 - August 24, 1920 Land Contract, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 55 - April 26, 1935 Deed, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 56 - July 23, 1914 Deed, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 57 - 1920 Plat Map Depicting T44 R7W, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 58 - Portion of a 1927 Bayfield County Map, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 59 - November 20, 1919 Deed, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 60 - March 17, 1953 Deed, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 61 - September 2015 Chequamegon-Nicolet National Forest Forest-wide Travel Analysis Report, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 62 - Portion of 1980 Plantation and Seeding Map of Drummond Area, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 63 - Placeholder - Video file to be delivered to the Court of roadways leading to Ronkowski property narrated by Randy Erickson, Forest Land Surveyor, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 64 - Bayfield County Plat Book Page, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 65 - Forest Service Quad Map, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit 66 - Blow-up Portion of 1917 Map of T44N, R7W, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit 67 - 1920 Bayfield County Plat Book Pages, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit 68 - November 13, 2007 Letter from US Forest Service re: Eric Allen, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit 69 - September 29, 2009 Letter from Ronkowski to Randy Erickson, Forest Surveyor, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit 70 - May 9, 2008 Easement from Eric Allen to Ronkowski | ||
8 | 8
misc
Exhibit
Mon 10/02 10:23 AM
Stipulation Regarding Authenticity of Exhibits filed by Joann Ronkowski, Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr., (Mich, Robert) Modified on 10/2/2017. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 21 - July 24, 2008 Letter from National Forest Service, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 22 - July 31, 2008 from Ronkowski to National Forest Service, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 23 - (Part 1 of 2) August 13, 2009 Letter from Ronkowski to National Forest Service w/exhibits I-N, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 23 - (Part 2 of 2) August 13, 2009 Letter from Ronkowski to National Forest Service w/exhibits I-N, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 24 - August 31, 2009 Letter from National Forest Service to Ronkowski, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 25 - November 3, 2009 Letter from National Forest Service, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 26 - March 30, 2010 Letter from National Forest Service to Ronkowski, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 27 - August 3, 2011 from National Forest Service to Ronkowski, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 28 - 8/20/10-12/31/12 Emails Exchanged Between Ronkowski and Erickson of National Forest Service, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 29 - 8/3/11 and 4/27/12 Letters from National Forest Services Received by Ronkowski, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 30 - Schedules of Proposed Actions Relating to Ronkowski Property, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 31 - May 24-26, 2017 Emails Exchanged Between Ronkowski and National Forestry Service, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 32 - August 26, 2016 Letter from National Forest Service to Ronkowski, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 33 - Portions of a 2009 Chequamegon-Nicolet National Forest Motor Vehicle Use Map, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 34 - 1992 Aerial Photograph, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 35 - 1998 Aerial Photograph, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 36 - 2005 Aerial Photograph, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 37 - 2009 Aerial Photograph, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 38 - 2010 Aerial Photograph, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 39 - 2015 Aerial Photograph, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 40 - Surveyor's Records from 1970-2002 re: Rorner #4407070020, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit 41 - Surveyor's Records from 1970-2002 re: Corner #4408120000, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit 42 - 1971 Plat Maps, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit 43 - Certified Death Certificate for Josephine I. Ronkowski, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit 44 - 1951 Aerial Photograph | ||
7 | 7
motion
Stipulation
Mon 10/02 9:51 AM
Stipulation Regarding Authenticity of Exhibits by Plaintiffs Edward E. Ronkowski, Jr, Joann Ronkowski, (Mich, Robert) Modified on 10/2/2017. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 1887 Deed, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - May 7, 1919 Deed, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - May 13, 1919 Deed, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - 1940 Tax Deed, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - December 15, 1944 Deed, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - May 25, 1951 Deed, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - December 1, 1969 Deed, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - February 24, 1971 Deed, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - August 10, 1972 Deed, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - July 22, 1920 Deed, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - April 23, 1935 Deed, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - 1917 WI Historical Society Map of Bayfield County, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - 1917 WI Historical Society Map of Lands for Sale in the Town of Drummond, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - Portion of a 1920 WI Historical Society Road Map of the Town of Drummond, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 - 1928 WI Historical Society Land Survey Maps of the Town of Drummond, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 16 - 1938 Aerial Photo, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 17 - 1927 National Forest Service Map, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 - February 20, 2007 Letter from National Forest Service, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 19 - August 24, 2007 Letter from National Forest Service, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 20 - Ronkowski's Application filed on June 2, 2008 | ||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Pretrial Conference Order
Thu 06/15 1:08 PM
Pretrial Conference Order - Amendments to Pleadings due 7/31/2017. Dispositive Motions due 2/16/2018. Settlement Letters due 6/22/2018. Motions in Limine due 6/29/2018. Response to Motion due 7/13/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/26/2018 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 7/30/2018 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/15/17. (jat) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
minutes
Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference
Wed 06/14 2:37 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 6/14/2017 [:05] (skv) |
||
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report
Thu 06/08 12:08 PM
Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Defendant United States of America, (Humphrey, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Discovery Plan | ||
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/23 2:43 PM
ANSWER by Defendant United States of America. (Humphrey, Richard) |
|
utility
Set Pretrial or Status Conference
Tue 05/23 3:17 PM
Set Telephone Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 6/14/2017 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [[LINK:Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference] attached] (jat) |
||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Affidavit of Service as to USA
Mon 04/03 10:59 AM
Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. All Defendants. (Mich, Robert) Modified on 4/3/2017: Contains multiple exhibits. Counsel notified that for future filings, exhibits must be attached separately and described. (lak) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 9:02 AM
Summons Issued as to United States of America. (jat) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 8:55 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-1993695.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mich, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
utility
Add Judge for Shell Case Opening
Wed 03/22 8:59 AM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat) |
||
utility
Standard Attachments Sent
Wed 03/22 9:00 AM
Standard attachments for Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:NORTC] ,[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] ,[LINK:Order on Dispositive Motions] . (jat) |