Alderman et al v. Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC(CONSENT)
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Russ Walker |
Referred: | Susan Russ Walker |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00163 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 18, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 4:37 AM CDT |
Defendant
Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
C. Wayne Alderman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Alderman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 01/18 3:08 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This matter is before the court on the parties' joint stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, which the court construes as having been filed pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). See Doc. 24 . It is ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action with prejudice. Costs are taxed as paid. It is further ORDERED that the pending "Motion for Settlement" is DENIED as MOOT. See Doc. 23 . This case is closed. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter this order as a final judgment pursuant to FRCP 58. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 1/18/2018. (dmn, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 01/10 1:35 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal JOINT by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. (Darmer, Angel) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Settlement
Wed 12/20 1:56 PM
MOTION for Settlement Joint Notice of Settlement by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC, C. Wayne Alderman, Mary Alderman. (Darmer, Angel) Modified on 12/20/2017 to include additional filers. (dmn, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Mediation and Settlement Conference
Tue 12/12 8:59 AM
Notice of Mediation and Settlement Conference by All Plaintiffs (Barrett, James) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Mediation and Settlement Conference
Mon 12/11 4:52 PM
Notice of Mediation and Settlement Conference by All Plaintiffs (Barrett, James) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Protective Order
Wed 08/09 11:48 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDERGRANTING 19 Joint MOTION for entry of Protective Order, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/9/17. (djy, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Protective Order
Wed 08/02 11:36 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC.(Darmer, Angel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order | ||
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 07/14 11:24 AM
ORDER: In accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c), and upon the voluntary consent of the parties (ECF 16 and 17 ), it is hereby ordered that this case shall be reassigned to the United States Magistrate Judge Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker for all remaining proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment. Any appeal from judgment shall be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit. Signed by Honorable Judge Clay D. Land on 7/14/2017. (dmn, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/11 3:32 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by C. Wayne Alderman, Mary Alderman. (dmn, ) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/11 3:31 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. (dmn, ) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 07/07 3:10 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The final pretrial conference and trial will beset by a future order; dispositive and daubert Motions due by 1/9/2018; Amended Pleadings due by 9/20/2017; Discovery completed by 12/9/2017; Mediation Notice due by 12/14/2017, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 7/7/17. (djy, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Protective Order
Tue 05/23 10:29 AM
HIPAA ORDER IN CIVIL ACTION as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 5/23/2017. (dmn, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Non-Compliance
Tue 05/16 9:49 AM
NOTICE of Non-Compliance re11 Notice of Service of Discovery, and12 Notice of Service of Discovery. The referenced documents are discovery and are not allowed pursuant to Local Rule 26.3 NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY. The documents are hereby STRICKEN from the record and the parties are instructed to disregard the entry of these documents on the court docket. (dmn, ) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
discov
Response to Discovery Request
Mon 05/15 2:31 PM
RESPONSE to Discovery Request from C. Wayne Alderman by C. Wayne Alderman.(Barrett, James) |
|
11 | 11
discov
Answer to Interrogatories
Mon 05/15 2:29 PM
ANSWER to Interrogatories from C. Wayne Alderman by C. Wayne Alderman.(Barrett, James) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/14 11:25 AM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by C. Wayne Alderman, Mary Alderman. (Barrett, James) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Thu 04/13 11:18 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Darmer, Angel) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 03/29 2:28 PM
RULE 26(f) ORDER directing the parties to file the Rule 26(f) report containing the proposed discovery plan as further set out in the order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/18/2017. Counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete and send to the Clerk of the Court the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 4/18/2017 as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/29/2017. (dmn, ) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Jury Demand
Tue 03/28 5:03 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by C. Wayne Alderman, Mary Alderman. (Barrett, James) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/27 2:30 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker for consideration, disposition and/or recommendation regarding all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Clay D. Land on 3/27/2017. (dmn, ) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/23 1:07 PM
Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Clay D. Land. Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, ) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 03/23 11:07 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC.(dmn, ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/23 11:06 AM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. (dmn, ) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/23 11:03 AM
CERTIFICATE by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC of REMOVAL re1 Notice of Removal. (dmn, ) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 03/23 11:01 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC from Circuit Court of Lee County, Alabama, case number 43-cv-17-900091. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602044649)(dmn, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, Declaration of Jaclyn Chapman, | ||
Att: 3 Filing Fee Receipt, | ||
Att: 4 State Court Complaint | ||
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/23 11:02 AM
COMPLAINT against Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC, filed by C. Wayne Alderman, Mary Alderman.(dmn, ) (NO PDF, see Doc.1 .) |