Thornton v. AMF Bowling Centers, Inc.
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Wallace Capel, Jr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00165 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12181Americans with Disabilities Act-Public Accommodations Private |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 4:06 AM CDT |
Defendant
AMF Bowling Centers, Inc.
2 North Jackson Street; Suite 605
Montgomery, AL 36104 |
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Thornton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 06/08 9:19 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41. Copy mailed to defendant. (djy, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 06/07 12:01 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christopher Thornton (Sexton, Lowell) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss
Mon 05/22 6:57 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Christopher Thornton. (Sexton, Lowell) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 05/11 3:30 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff's8 Motion for an Extension of Time for Defendant to Appear and Respond to the Complaint. It is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall appear and file its responsive pleading on or before 6/14/2017. Answer due from AMF Bowling Centers, Inc. on 6/14/2017. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/11/2017. (dmn, ) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 05/11 2:25 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Christopher Thornton. (Taylor, Cassie) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 04/10 4:23 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff's6 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Appear and Respond to the Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant shall appear and file its responsive pleading on or before 5/15/2017. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 4/10/2017. (dmn, ) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 04/07 5:18 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Christopher Thornton. (Taylor, Cassie) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Return Receipt Card
Wed 03/29 8:47 AM
Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and complaint signed by Laura Payne for AMF Bowling Centers, Inc. served on 3/24/2017, answer due 4/14/2017. (djy, ) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 3:35 PM
Summons Issued as to AMF Bowling Centers, Inc. and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint to defendant c/o Agent. (djy, ) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge
Wed 03/22 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) Christopher Thornton. (djy, ) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/22 2:13 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Christopher Thornton. (djy, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 2:12 PM
COMPLAINT against AMF Bowling Centers, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602044657.), filed by Christopher Thornton.(djy, ) |
|
Att: 1 fee receipt |