Gina Jaeger v. Peak Medical Montana Operation, et al
Original Case: 2:16-cv-00030
Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-35234 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 02, 2017 1:52 AM PDT |
Defendant
AMBER DAYHUFF
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GENESIS HEALTHCARE, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WILLIAM POWELL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DANA WADDELL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
PEAK MEDICAL MONTANA OPERATIONS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
GINA JAEGER, individually, and as Personal Representative of the Estate of her sister, Charlene Hill
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/02/2017 1:36 AM PDT |
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/27/2017. Transcript ordered by 04/17/2017. Transcript due 05/16/2017. Appellant Gina Jaeger opening brief due 06/26/2017. Appellees Amber Dayhuff, Genesis Healthcare, Inc., Peak Medical Montana Operations, LLC, William Powell and Dana Waddell answering brief due 07/25/2017. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10363146] (JMR) [Entered: 03/20/2017 11:43 AM] | |
2 | 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Gina Jaeger Correspondence: Notice to Clerk of Court of 9th Circuit Court of Appeals regarding dismissal of defendants. Date of service: 03/20/2017 [10363935] 17-35234 (Oaas, Torger) [Entered: 03/20/2017 02:52 PM] |