Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth D Katz
Case #: 4:17-bk-40501
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2017
Terminated:Oct 29, 2020
Plan Confirmed:Jul 01, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
KCST USA, Inc.
300 Baker Ave
Concord, MA 01742-2131
Represented By
Harold B. Murphy
Murphy & King, P. C.
contact info
Andrew G. Lizotte
Murphy & King
contact info
Last checked: never
Assistant U.S. Trustee
Richard King
Office of US. Trustee 446 Main Street 14th Floor
Worcester, MA 01608


1. KCST USA files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy (masslive.com)
Submitted Fri 03/24/2017
Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago
Thursday, October 29, 2020
368 368 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Final Decree Thu 10/29 10:14 AM
Order dated 10/29/2020 Re:362 Motion filed by Debtor KCST USA, Inc. for Entry of Final Decree. GRANTED. THE HEARING SET FOR OCTOBER 30, 2020 IS CANCELED. See Order for Full Text. (pf)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case (Ch.11 Only) Thu 10/29 10:19 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (pf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
367 367 answer Response Tue 10/27 5:28 PM
Response (Statement Of No Objection) with certificate of service filed by Assistant U.S. Trustee Richard King Re:362 Motion filed by Debtor KCST USA, Inc. for Final Decree with certificate of service. (Meunier, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2020
366 366 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Fri 10/23 3:30 PM
Endorsed Order dated 10/23/2020 Re:365 Assented to Motion filed by Assistant U.S. Trustee Richard King to Extend the Time to File an Objection to362 Motion by Debtor for Entry of Final Decree. GRANTED. THE DEADLINE FOR THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE IS EXTENDED TO OCTOBER 28, 2020 AT 4:30 P.M. (pf)
Related: [-]
365 365 motion Extend Time Fri 10/23 1:57 PM
Assented to Motion filed by Assistant U.S. Trustee Richard King to Extend the Time to File an Objection to362 Motion by Debtor for Entry of Final Decree with certificate of service. (Meunier, Stephen)
Related: [-]