TOLSON v. CUSTOMIZED TRUCKIN INC, et al
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Tilman E Self, III |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00106 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.) |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 4:44 AM EDT |
Defendant
CROWLEY LINER SERVICES INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CUSTOMIZED TRUCKING INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
VEHID SEHIC
1249 Summit Oaks Drive West
Jacksonville, FL 32221 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RICHARD BLAKE TOLSON
7101 Wimpy Road
Macon, GA 31216 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 05/09 3:39 PM
ORDER denying26 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and GRANTING Plaintiff's Leave of Court to Dismiss this case. Plaintiff's action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 5/9/2018. (chc) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 03/26 2:37 PM
RESPONSE filed by CROWLEY LINER SERVICES INC, CUSTOMIZED TRUCKING INC, VEHID SEHIC, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT re26 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (MOSER, SHEA) |
|
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 03/23 3:54 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by RICHARD BLAKE TOLSON filed by JOEL GRIST.(GRIST, JOEL) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/23 11:52 AM
Case ASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III. US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS no longer assigned to the case. (ans) |
||
Monday, January 15, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 01/15 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena by CUSTOMIZED TRUCKING INC (MOSER, SHEA) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Tue 12/12 11:14 AM
ORDER granting23 JOINT MOTION to Amend/Correct19 Scheduling/Discovery Order. Discovery to be completed by June 1, 2018. Dispositive motions to be filed no later than July 10, 2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 12/12/2017 (mdm) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 12/04 11:38 AM
JOINT MOTION to Amend/Correct19 Scheduling/Discovery Order, by CROWLEY LINER SERVICES INC, CUSTOMIZED TRUCKING INC, VEHID SEHIC, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT filed by SHEA MICHAEL MOSER.(MOSER, SHEA) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Discovery and Scheduling Order | ||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 11/03 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena by CUSTOMIZED TRUCKING INC (MOSER, SHEA) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 09/14 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena by CUSTOMIZED TRUCKING INC (MOSER, SHEA) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 06/30 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena by CUSTOMIZED TRUCKING INC (MOSER, SHEA) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Scheduling/Discovery Order
Wed 06/14 10:34 AM
SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER :Discovery to be complete by 12/11/2017. Dispositive motions due by 1/10/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 6/14/2017.(bcl) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order - Rules 16/26
Mon 05/15 3:31 PM
RULES 16/26 ORDER :Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 6/15/2017. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 05/15/2017.(far) |
|
Att: 1 Required Form | ||
17 | 17
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 05/15 11:35 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT identifying Corporate Parent TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY CORP., Corporate Parent THE PHOENIX INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY, Corporate Parent TRAVELERS INSURANCE GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., Corporate Parent THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC. for THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT. (MOSER, SHEA) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 05/11 2:06 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CUSTOMIZED TRUCKING INC identifying Corporate Parent CROWLEY MARITIME CORPORATION for CUSTOMIZED TRUCKING INC. (MOSER, SHEA) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 05/11 2:02 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CROWLEY LINER SERVICES INC identifying Corporate Parent CROWLEY MARITIME CORPORATION for CROWLEY LINER SERVICES INC. (MOSER, SHEA) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Thu 05/11 8:51 AM
Notice of Deficiency ; Document must be refiled to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case. (bcl) |
||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/10 11:13 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CROWLEY LINER SERVICES INC (MOSER, SHEA) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/10 11:11 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CUSTOMIZED TRUCKING INC (MOSER, SHEA) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 05/04 4:05 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by CROWLEY LINER SERVICES INC, CUSTOMIZED TRUCKING INC, VEHID SEHIC, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT.(MOSER, SHEA) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 04/26 12:57 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Parties. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 4/26/2017 (bcl) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 04/24 4:56 PM
JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by RICHARD BLAKE TOLSON filed by JOEL GRIST.(GRIST, JOEL) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion | ||
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 04/11 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JAMES F MOSELEY, JR on behalf of CROWLEY LINER SERVICES INC, CUSTOMIZED TRUCKING INC, VEHID SEHIC, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT Attorney JAMES F MOSELEY, JR added to party CROWLEY LINER SERVICES INC(pty:dft), Attorney JAMES F MOSELEY, JR added to party CUSTOMIZED TRUCKING INC(pty:dft), Attorney JAMES F MOSELEY, JR added to party VEHID SEHIC(pty:dft), Attorney JAMES F MOSELEY, JR added to party THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT(pty:dft) (MOSELEY, JAMES) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 04/11 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by SHEA MICHAEL MOSER on behalf of CROWLEY LINER SERVICES INC, CUSTOMIZED TRUCKING INC, VEHID SEHIC, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT Attorney SHEA MICHAEL MOSER added to party CROWLEY LINER SERVICES INC(pty:dft), Attorney SHEA MICHAEL MOSER added to party CUSTOMIZED TRUCKING INC(pty:dft), Attorney SHEA MICHAEL MOSER added to party VEHID SEHIC(pty:dft), Attorney SHEA MICHAEL MOSER added to party THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT(pty:dft) (MOSER, SHEA) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Tue 04/04 3:14 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to1 Complaint,3 Summons Issued Acknowledgment filed by VEHID SEHIC. (MOSER, SHEA) |
|
6 | 6
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Tue 04/04 3:12 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to1 Complaint,3 Summons Issued Acknowledgment filed by CROWLEY LINER SERVICES INC. (MOSER, SHEA) |
|
5 | 5
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Tue 04/04 3:10 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to1 Complaint,3 Summons Issued Acknowledgment filed by CUSTOMIZED TRUCKING INC. (MOSER, SHEA) |
|
4 | 4
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Tue 04/04 3:07 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to1 Complaint,3 Summons Issued Acknowledgment filed by THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT. (MOSER, SHEA) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 3:48 PM
Summons Issued as to CROWLEY LINER SERVICES INC, CUSTOMIZED TRUCKING INC, VEHID SEHIC, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT. (bcl) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Consent Form (28 USC 636) Sent
Wed 03/22 3:45 PM
Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to RICHARD BLAKE TOLSON (bcl) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Complaint
Wed 03/22 3:31 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2571412, $400 filed by Richard Blake Tolson(GRIST, JOEL) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons -Set of 4 Summonses | ||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Wed 03/22 3:40 PM
Notice of Deficiency - For future reference, all parties must be added using ALL CAPS. (i.e. LISA SMITH or DELTAAIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions as to howto add parties, please refer to the Middle District of Georgias Style Guidehttp://www.gamd.uscourts.gov/sites/gamd/files/StyleGuideEfiling.pdf. NOTE: If the party inwhich youre searching is currently in the database in lowercase letters, select the partycurrently in the system. (bcl) |