United States of America v. Jaques
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Theresa L Springmann |
Referred: | Joshua P Kolar |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00127 |
Nature of Suit | 690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other |
Cause | 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 06, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 5:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
Ronald W. Jaques
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
utility
Dismissal Notice to Parties Pursuant to Rule 41a1
Fri 12/06 8:16 AM
CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure re42 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. (rs) |
||
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
motion
Stipulation to Dismiss
Tue 12/03 12:46 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Sole Counts of Amended Complaint and Counterclaim by Plaintiff United States of America. (Sarnell, Bradley) |
|
Wednesday, November 06, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines 1 - Terminate Hearings
Wed 11/06 2:20 PM
STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/6/2019, before Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann. Pla appeared by atty Bradley Sarnell. Dft appeared by atty David Pruitt. Parties advise as to case status. Parties to file Dismissal Papers or status report by 12/18/2019. (FTR) (rs) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings
Mon 09/16 1:24 PM
TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/16/2019, before Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann. Pla appeared by atty Bradley Sarnell. Dft appeared by atty David Pruitt. Parties advise as to case status. Parties request thirty days to file a proposed judgment. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/6/2019 12:00 PM in US District Court - Hammond before Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann. Court to initiate the call. (FTR) (rs) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Status Report
Wed 09/11 10:56 AM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by United States of America. (Sarnell, Bradley) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 03/13 10:10 AM
ORDER FOR CHIEF JUDGE THERESA L. SPRINGMANN: Telephonic Trial Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2019 10:00 AM (CENTRAL TIME)in US District Court - Hammond before Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann. Court will initiate the call. (rs) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Tue 03/12 12:52 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. In consideration of the speedy administration of justice, and pursuant to N.D. Ind. L.R. 40-1(f), this action is reassigned from the docket of the late Judge Rudy Lozano to Chief Judge Theresa L. Springmann. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 3/12/2019. (jss) |
|
Friday, February 01, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Fri 02/01 3:05 PM
ORDER: Court GRANTS, with relief different than requested,35 Joint Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance. The Court hereby VACATES the discovery and expert discovery deadlines, to be reset if necessary. The Court ORDERS the parties to FILE on or before September 1, 2019, either a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 or a joint status report. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 2/1/2019. Text entry order. (tc) |
|
utility
Terminate Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 02/01 3:05 PM
***Deadlines terminated. (tc) |
||
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Stay
Thu 01/31 1:03 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay (Hold Case in Abeyance) by Plaintiff United States of America. (Sarnell, Bradley) |
|
Wednesday, January 09, 2019 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 01/09 12:47 PM
Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added pursuant to General Order 2019-1. Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry no longer assigned to case. (tc) |
||
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 12/14 10:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting33 Joint Motion for Extension of Fact Discovery, finding good cause shown. The discovery deadline is extended to 3/4/2019. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 12/14/2018. (mr) |
|
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 12/12 5:04 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Plaintiff United States of America. (Sarnell, Bradley) |
|
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 08/31 10:19 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting31 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests, finding good cause shown. The deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's discovery requests is extended to 9/18/2018. Text entry order by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 8/31/2018. (lns) |
|
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 08/30 6:06 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Plaintiff United States of America. (Sarnell, Bradley) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 07/31 1:09 PM
NOTICE by United States of America of Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests (Sarnell, Bradley) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 05/21 10:16 AM
MINTUE ORDER granting28 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, finding good cause shown. The deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Request for Production is extended to 5/25/2018. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 5/21/2018. (mr) |
|
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 05/18 11:18 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (UNOPPOSED) by Counter Claimant Ronald W. Jaques, Defendant Ronald W. Jaques. (Pruitt, David) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 04/18 11:55 AM
NOTICE by Ronald W. Jaques of Extension to Respond to Discovery Requests (Pruitt, David) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs
Wed 01/31 3:09 PM
TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 1/31/2018 before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry. Pla appeared by atty Bradley Sarnell. Dft appeared by attys David Pruitt and Patrick Thomas. All dates/ddl in Joint Report at24 through close of discovery are adopted and incorporated herein. Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 2/14/2018. Any motion for leave to amend pleadings to be filed by 1/31/2019. Pla expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the Dft by 3/4/2019. Dft expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the Pla by 4/3/2019. Supplemental expert reports due to other parties by 5/3/2019. Discovery deadline is 1/31/2019. Expert Discovery deadline is 6/14/2019. Magistrate Consent forms due by 2/21/2018. The summary judgment ddl in FRCP 56 shall not apply. All other dates/ddl to be set by the presiding trial judge upon conclusion of discovery. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Fri 01/19 5:15 PM
ANSWER to19 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by United States of America.(Sarnell, Bradley) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
Fri 01/19 4:37 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sarnell, Bradley) |
|
utility
Terminate Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 01/22 9:33 AM
***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. Deficiency Deadline Termed as Report of Planning Meeting filed under DE 24 (mlc) |
||
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings
Fri 12/29 9:55 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2018 at 10:30 am is VACATED and RESET for 1/31/2018 at 2:30 pm EST (1:30 pm CST). Change in time only. Court to initiate call. By Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 12/29/2017. (mr) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 12/28 12:28 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting21 Joint Motion to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference. The telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2018 at 11:00 am is VACATED and RESET for 1/31/2018 at 10:30 am EST in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry. Court to initiate call. Parties' proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) to be filed by 1/24/2018. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 12/28/2017. (mr) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Continue
Fri 12/22 5:16 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue January 3, 2018 Pre-Trial Conference by Counter Claimant Ronald W. Jaques, Defendant Ronald W. Jaques. (Pruitt, David) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 12/14 11:36 AM
MINUTE ORDER for Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry: The Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference is reset for 1/3/2018 at 11:00 am EST in US District Court - Fort Wayne. Court to initiate call. Parties' proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) to be filed by 12/29/2017. Text entry order. (mr) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim
Tue 11/28 5:14 PM
ANSWER to15 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America by Ronald W. Jaques.(Thomas, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Wed 11/22 1:52 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Continue Prelmiminary Pretrial Conference finding good cause shown. The Court VACATES the 11/30/2017 Prelimiary Pretrial Conference to be reset, by separate entry, to a date after the 11/28/2017 deadline for Defendant to respond to the Amended Complaint filed on 11/14/2017. The Court also ORDERS that the Motion to Dismiss13 is hereby withdrawn based on Defendant's Notice of Withdrawal17 . Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 11/22/2017. (smb) |
|
utility
Terminate Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 11/22 1:52 PM
***Hearing terminated. (smb) |
||
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 11/21 5:02 PM
NOTICE by Ronald W. Jaques re13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Thomas, Patrick) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Continue
Tue 11/21 4:57 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Defendant Ronald W. Jaques. (Thomas, Patrick) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 11/14 12:02 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ronald W. Jaques, filed by United States of America.(Sarnell, Bradley) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Brief in Support
Wed 11/08 4:43 PM
BRIEF in Support of13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ronald W. Jaques. (Thomas, Patrick) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 11/08 4:42 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Ronald W. Jaques. (Thomas, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated
Wed 10/25 3:29 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. (mr) |
|
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 10/25 3:28 PM
ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2017 at 11:00 AM Eastern Time before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry, w/the Court initiating the conference. Parties' proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) to be filed by 11/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 10/25/2017. (mr) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/13 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick W Thomas on behalf of Ronald W. Jaques (Thomas, Patrick) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 10/10 9:43 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Ronald W. Jaques answer due 11/8/2017. (mlc) |
||
Monday, October 09, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice - Other
Mon 10/09 10:09 AM
NOTICE by Ronald W. Jaques of Automatic Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Pruitt, David) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 10/09 10:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David R Pruitt on behalf of Ronald W. Jaques (Pruitt, David) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 09/22 5:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Ronald W. Jaques served on 9/20/2017, answer due 10/11/2017. (Sarnell, Bradley) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 06/19 9:11 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Finding good cause shown under FRCP 4(m), the Court GRANTS5 Motion to Extend Time For Service by Plaintiff United States of America. The deadline for Plaintiff United States of America to serve Defendant Ronald W Jaques with the summons and complaint is extended to 9/21/2017. Text only entry. By Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 6/19/2017. (lns) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 06/16 5:12 PM
MOTION Extend Time For Service by Plaintiff United States of America.(Sarnell, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Bradley Sarnell in Support of Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A: Return of Non-Service | ||
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 05/01 10:20 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Rudy Lozano for all further proceedings. Judge Jon E DeGuilio no longer assigned to case. Magistrate Consent forms due by 5/22/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/1/2017. (rmc) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Thu 04/06 6:41 PM
ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 4/6/2017. (smb) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 2:15 PM
Summons Issued as to Ronald W. Jaques. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 9:43 AM
COMPLAINT against Ronald W. Jaques, filed by United States of America.(Sarnell, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons for Ronald W. Jaques | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 03/22 2:07 PM
Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry added. (NEW CASE) (mlc) |