United States of America v. $32,900.00 U.S. Currency
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Rudy Lozano |
Referred: | Paul R Cherry |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00130 |
Nature of Suit | 690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other |
Cause | 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 5:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
$32,900.00 U.S. Currency
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
U.S. Attorney's Office 5400 Federal Plaza
Hammond, IN 46320 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Clerks Judgment
Tue 03/20 10:21 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (jss) |
|
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Tue 03/20 10:20 AM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORFEITURE: The9 Motion for Default Judgment and Decree of Forfeiture is GRANTED. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that a default judgment be entered against defendant property, Anthony Toney, and all persons who may claim an interest in defendant property; and IT FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that defendant property, to wit, $32,900.00, be forfeited to the United States of America and no right, title or interest in said property shall exist in any other person. Signed by Judge Rudy Lozano on 3/19/2018. (jss) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 02/21 6:07 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendants property, Anthony Toney any and all persons who may claim an interest in defendants property by Plaintiff United States of America.(Szewciw - AUSA, Orest) |
|
Att: 1 DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORFEITURE, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Publication | ||
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Clerks Entry of Default - form will be generated
Tue 11/07 10:44 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Defendant Property, Anthony Toney, and All Unknown Persons who may claim an interest in the above-entitled cause* regarding7 Application for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by United States of America. (tc) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Application for Clerks Entry of Default
Mon 11/06 5:47 PM
APPLICATION FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT by United States of America as to Anthony Toney, and All Unknown Persons failing to file a claim.(Szewciw - AUSA, Orest) |
|
Att: 1 Verified Statement in Support of Entry of Default | ||
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 10/19 6:17 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re1 Complaint,2 Warrant Issued (Szewciw - AUSA, Orest) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 05/01 10:41 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Rudy Lozano for all further proceedings. Judge Philip P Simon no longer assigned to case. Magistrate Consent forms due by 5/22/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/1/17. (jld) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Thu 04/06 6:42 PM
ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 4/6/2017. (smb) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/23 11:42 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re1 Complaint,2 Warrant Issued(Szewciw - AUSA, Orest) |
|
Att: 1 DIRECT NOTICE OF JUDICIAL FORFEITURE PROCEEDINGS | ||
2 | 2
order
Warrant Issued
Thu 03/23 8:55 AM
WARRANT of Arrest in Rem issued. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (mlc) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 03/23 8:47 AM
Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry added. (NEW CASE) (mlc) |
||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 6:27 PM
COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against $32,900.00 U.S. Currency, filed by United States of America.(Szewciw - AUSA, Orest) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons /Warrant for Arrest in Rem |