Laliberte v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane Triche Milazzo |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02351 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 4:08 AM CDT |
Defendant
Northstar RX, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Hospira, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharma Global, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharma Global FZE
|
|
Defendant
Hospira Worldwide, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Aventis Pharma S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Accord Healthcare, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Nichole M. Laliberte
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Terminated: 05/26/2017
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer, Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2017
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2017
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 05/21 4:15 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Thu 09/21 2:51 PM
Summons Issued as to Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (Payton, Paige) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Request for Summons Issued
Wed 09/20 1:38 PM
Request of Summons Issued as to Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. filed by Nichole M. Laliberte re1 Complaint,,.(Miceli, David) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/06 12:12 PM
Summons Issued as to Hospira, Inc.. (cc) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Request for Summons Issued
Mon 06/05 11:17 AM
Request of Summons Issued as to Hospira, Inc. filed by Nichole M. Laliberte re1 Complaint,,.(Miceli, David) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Hospira Inc. | ||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Taxotere Amended Complaint
Thu 05/25 3:40 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT by Nichole M. Laliberte. Party Sanofi US Services Inc., Hospira, Inc., Sun Pharma Global FZE and Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd. added. (Miceli, David) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Tue 04/11 3:25 PM
PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 11:48 AM
Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Aventis Pharma S.A., Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Northstar RX, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Dellucci, kristen) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 03/22 10:11 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 9:45 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6038774) filed by Nichole M. Laliberte.Attorney David Francis Miceli added to party Nichole M. Laliberte(pty:pla).(Miceli, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Accord Healthcare, Inc., | ||
Att: 3 Summons Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., | ||
Att: 4 Summons Hospira Worldwide, Inc., | ||
Att: 5 Summons McKesson Corporation, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Northstar Rx LLC, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Pfizer, Inc, | ||
Att: 8 Summons Sandoz Inc, | ||
Att: 9 Summons Aventis-Pharma S.A., | ||
Att: 10 Summons Sanofi S.A., | ||
Att: 11 Summons Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC |