Fassl v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane Triche Milazzo |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02360 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 3:20 AM CDT |
Defendant
Aventis Pharma S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharma Global, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Accord Healthcare, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Hospira Worldwide, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Hospira, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharma Global FZE
|
|
Plaintiff
Diana M. Fassl
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Terminated: 05/26/2017
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Terminated: 07/19/2017
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
Terminated: 07/20/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 05/21 4:16 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Wed 09/20 10:04 AM
Summons Issued as to Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (tm) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Request for Summons Issued
Tue 09/19 7:28 PM
Request of Summons Issued as to Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. filed by Diana M. Fassl re1 Complaint,.(Miceli, David) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/01 1:17 PM
Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd., Hospira Worldwide, Inc., Hospira, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sun Pharma Global, Inc.. (Payton, Paige) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Request for Summons Issued
Wed 05/31 10:57 AM
Request of Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd., Hospira Worldwide, Inc., Hospira, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sun Pharma Global, Inc. filed by Diana M. Fassl re1 Complaint,.(Miceli, David) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Accord Healthcare, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Actavis Pharma Inc., | ||
Att: 3 Summons Caraco, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Hospira Inc., | ||
Att: 5 Summons Hospira Worldwide Inc., | ||
Att: 6 Summons Pfizer Inc., | ||
Att: 7 Summons Sandoz, Inc., | ||
Att: 8 Summons Sun Pharma Global Inc. | ||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Taxotere Amended Complaint
Thu 05/25 12:12 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT by Diana M. Fassl. Party Sanofi US Services Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, Inc., Hospira, Inc., Sun Pharma Global, Inc., Sun Pharma Global FZE, Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd., Pfizer, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC and Actavis Pharma, Inc. added. (Miceli, David) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Tue 04/11 3:26 PM
PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 11:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (am) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 03/22 10:47 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (jeg) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 10:29 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6039082) filed by Diana M. Fassl.Attorney David Francis Miceli added to party Diana M. Fassl(pty:pla).(Miceli, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Aventis Pharma S.A., | ||
Att: 3 Summons Sanofi S.A., | ||
Att: 4 Summons Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC |