Autry v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane Triche Milazzo |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02361 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 4:14 AM CDT |
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Hospira, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharma Global, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Hospira Worldwide, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Aventis Pharma S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharma Global FZE
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Accord Healthcare, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Vicki B. Autry
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Northstar RX, LLC
Terminated: 05/26/2017
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer, Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2017
|
|
Defendant
Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
Fri 03/29 1:32 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL With prejudice prejudice by Brandon Todd Autry originally filed at Rec. Doc. 16865 in 16-MD-2740. (cs) |
|
Thursday, April 30, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Taxotere Amended Complaint
Thu 04/30 1:52 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT by Vicki B. Autry against Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc. and Sandoz Inc. (Filed per Rec. Doc. 10075 in 16-MD-2740) (ecm) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 05/21 4:17 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Wed 09/20 9:56 AM
Summons Issued as to Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (tm) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Request for Summons Issued
Tue 09/19 5:13 PM
Request of Summons Issued as to Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. filed by Vicki B. Autry re1 Complaint,,.(Miceli, David) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/06 12:18 PM
Summons Issued as to Hospira, Inc.. (cc) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Request for Summons Issued
Mon 06/05 11:48 AM
Request of Summons Issued as to Hospira, Inc. filed by Vicki B. Autry re1 Complaint,,.(Miceli, David) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Hospira Inc. | ||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Taxotere Amended Complaint
Thu 05/25 11:34 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT by Vicki B. Autry. Party Sanofi US Services Inc., Hospira, Inc., Sun Pharma Global FZE, Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd. and Allergan Finance LLC added. (Miceli, David) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Tue 04/11 3:26 PM
PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/23 8:42 AM
Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Aventis Pharma S.A., Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Northstar RX, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.(tm) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 03/22 12:11 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 10:51 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6039218) filed by Vicki B. Autry.Attorney David Francis Miceli added to party Vicki B. Autry(pty:pla).(Miceli, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Accord Healthcare, Inc., | ||
Att: 3 Summons Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., | ||
Att: 4 Summons Hospira Worldwide, Inc., | ||
Att: 5 Summons McKesson Corporation, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Northstar Rx LLC, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Pfizer, Inc., | ||
Att: 8 Summons Sandoz, Inc., | ||
Att: 9 Summons Aventis Pharma S.A., | ||
Att: 10 Summons Sanofi S.A., | ||
Att: 11 Summons Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC |