Puckett v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02367 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 28, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 4:09 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Donna K Puckett
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, August 28, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 08/28 4:34 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE originally filed in Master Case 14-md-2592 as rec doc 17741. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/30/2020.(jeg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Fri 03/31 2:27 PM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 2:47 PM
Summons Issued as to Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare AG, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company. (am) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 03/22 12:05 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 12:01 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6040202) filed by Donna K Puckett.Attorney Emanuella J. Paulos added to party Donna K Puckett(pty:pla).(Paulos, Emanuella) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Bayer AG, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Bayer Corporation, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Bayer Healthcare AG, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Bayer Healthcare LLC, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Bayer Pharma AG, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Johnson & Johnson, | ||
Att: 8 Summons Janssen Ortho LLC, | ||
Att: 9 Summons Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, | ||
Att: 10 Summons Janssen Research & Development, | ||
Att: 11 Summons Bayer Healthcare Pharma Inc |