Pridmore et al v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02371 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 28, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 4:10 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Company
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Hope Pridmore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Pridmore
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 28, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 08/28 4:44 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE originally filed in Master Case 14-md-2592 as rec doc 17741. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/30/2020.(jeg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Fri 03/31 2:28 PM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 3:03 PM
Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG.(Dellucci, kristen) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
4 | 4
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 03/22 1:27 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (jeg) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 12:53 PM
Request of Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by James Pridmore, Hope Pridmore re1 Complaint,,. (Murphy, Peyton) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 12:53 PM
Request of Summons Issued as to Bayer Pharma AG filed by James Pridmore, Hope Pridmore re1 Complaint,,. (Murphy, Peyton) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 12:43 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare AG, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC f/k/a Johnson and Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6040441) filed by James Pridmore, Hope Pridmore.Attorney Peyton Patrick Murphy added to party Hope Pridmore(pty:pla), Attorney Peyton Patrick Murphy added to party James Pridmore(pty:pla).(Murphy, Peyton) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |