Gadd v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02375 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 31, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 3:50 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Company
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Robin Gadd
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 08/31 1:00 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE originally filed in Master Case 14-md-2592 as rec doc 17741. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/30/2020.(jeg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Fri 03/31 2:30 PM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 3:18 PM
Summons Issued as to Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company. (am) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 03/22 1:51 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 1:42 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6040636) filed by Robin Gadd as Representative of the Wrongful Death Estate of George Barrett.Attorney Sarah Jane Graziano added to party Robin Gadd as Representative of the Wrongful Death Estate of George Barrett(pty:pla).(Graziano, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons |