Griffin v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02382 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 21, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 4:08 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Company
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Mary D Griffin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, July 21, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 07/21 10:37 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case with Prejudice - originally filed as rec. doc. 17774 in master case 14-md-2592. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/14/2020.(caa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Fri 03/31 2:32 PM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/23 8:52 AM
Summons Issued as to Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare AG, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company. (mf) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 03/22 3:24 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 3:19 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6041146) filed by Mary Griffin.Attorney Debra Humphrey added to party Mary Griffin(pty:pla).(Humphrey, Debra) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Bayer AG, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Bayer Corporation, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Bayer Healthcare AG, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Bayer Pharma AG, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Janssen Orrtho LLC, | ||
Att: 8 Summons Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, | ||
Att: 9 Summons Janssen Research & Development LLC, | ||
Att: 10 Summons Johnson & Johnson Company, | ||
Att: 11 Summons Bayer Healthcare LLC |