Stewart v. International Paint, LLC, et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Susie Morgan |
Referred: | Karen Wells Roby |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02383 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 11, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 4:12 AM CDT |
Defendant
Zurich American Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
International Paint L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 05/11 1:26 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn) |
|
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 05/10 10:16 AM
NOTICE by International Paint L.L.C., Zurich American Insurance Company (Notice of Settlement) . (Forte, Gino) |
|
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 04/23 2:33 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby: Settlement Conference held on 4/20/2018. Negotiations were unsuccessful and a settlement was not reached. (NEF: Sect E) (caa) |
|
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 04/13 11:52 AM
ORDER: Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED that the14 Settlement Conference presently set before Chief Magistrate Judge Roby on 4/12/2018, at 2:00 PM is RESET to 4/20/2018, at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 4/12/2018.(jls) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
trial
Exhibit List
Mon 04/02 5:14 PM
Amended Exhibit List by Patrick Stewart. (Schoenberger, Kevin) |
|
20 | 20
trial
Witness List
Mon 04/02 5:13 PM
Amended Witness List by Patrick Stewart. (Schoenberger, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
trial
Witness and Exhibit List
Thu 03/29 11:40 AM
Amended Witness and Exhibit List by All Defendants. (Forte, Gino) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/28 8:43 AM
ORDER re15 Witness List filed by Patrick Stewart,16 Exhibit List filed by Patrick Stewart,17 Witness and Exhibit List filed by International Paint L.L.C., Zurich American Insurance Company - IT IS ORDERED that the Parties file amended witness and exhibit lists incorporating the requirements described herein by Wednesday, April 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/27/2018.(bwn) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
trial
Witness and Exhibit List
Tue 03/27 11:01 AM
Witness and Exhibit List by All Defendants. (Forte, Gino) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
trial
Exhibit List
Mon 03/26 1:16 PM
Exhibit List by Patrick Stewart. (Schoenberger, Kevin) |
|
15 | 15
trial
Witness List
Mon 03/26 1:15 PM
Witness List by Patrick Stewart. (Schoenberger, Kevin) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 01/19 9:58 AM
ORDER: Settlement Conference RESET for 4/12/2018 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby.(cml) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 09/07 4:43 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Status Conference held on 9/7/2017. The parties discussed the status of the case. The Court instructed the parties to contact the Magistrate Judge to schedule a Settlement Conference to be held as soon as practicable, but not later than two weeks prior to the Pre-Trial Conference. (jls) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order Set Hearings
Fri 06/30 11:18 AM
ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 4/30/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Counsel must immediately contact chambers with any conflicts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 6/29/2017.(tm) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 06/29 5:15 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/7/2017 at 1:30 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/31/2018 at 2:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. 3 day Jury Trial set for 6/25/2018 at 9:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. All discovery must be completed by 4/10/2018.(bwn) |
|
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form | ||
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order Set Hearings
Wed 06/07 9:12 AM
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - Preliminary Conference set for 6/29/2017 at 9:30 AM before case manager by telephone.(bwn) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 06/05 2:20 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,4 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand , ANSWER to1 Complaint,4 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by International Paint L.L.C., Zurich American Insurance Company.Attorney Wade Antoine Langlois, III added to party International Paint L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Wade Antoine Langlois, III added to party Zurich American Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Langlois, Wade) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 05/18 11:05 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Zurich American Insurance Company served on 5/16/2017, answer due 6/6/2017. (Schoenberger, Kevin) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 05/18 11:04 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; International Paint L.L.C. served on 5/16/2017, answer due 6/6/2017. (Schoenberger, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 05/09 1:17 PM
Summons Issued as to International Paint L.L.C., Zurich American Insurance Company.(clc) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Request for Summons Issued
Mon 05/08 3:27 PM
Request of Summons Issued as International Paint L.L.C., Zurich American Insurance Company filed by Patrick Stewart re4 Amended Complaint,1 Complaint.(Schoenberger, Kevin) Modified text on 5/9/2017 (clc) |
|
Att: 1 Summons International Paint, LLC, a Div. of Akzo Nobel Coatings, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Zurich American Insurance Co. | ||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 03/31 4:07 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Akzo Nobel Coatings, Inc., International Paint L.L.C., Zurich American Insurance Company filed by Patrick Stewart.(Schoenberger, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit No. 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit No. 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit No. 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit No. 4 | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Thu 03/23 4:56 PM
ORDER: ORDERED that Plaintiff amend the Complaint by April 3, 2017, at 5:00 p.m. The Plaintiff should amend the Complaint (1) to properly allege the citizenships of the Plaintiff and the Defendant for the purposes of diversity jurisdiction; and (2) to establish that the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000. Failure to comply with this order will result in a dismissal without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/23/2017.(clc) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 03/22 4:02 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (jeg) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 3:18 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against International Paint, LLC, a Division of Akzo Nobel Coatings, Inc., Zurich American Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6041307) filed by Patrick Stewart.Attorney Kevin C. Schoenberger added to party Patrick Stewart(pty:pla).(Schoenberger, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |