Perkins, Jr. v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02386 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 4:02 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Thomas E. Perkins, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 09/12 4:50 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE- originally filed as rec. doc. 10868 in master case 14-md-2592.(mmv) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Fri 03/31 2:33 PM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/23 8:31 AM
Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG.(ss) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 03/22 4:07 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 3:40 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6041448) filed by Thomas E Perkins, Jr..Attorney Marc Robert Stanley added to party Thomas E Perkins, Jr.(pty:pla).(Stanley, Marc) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., | ||
Att: 3 Summons Bayer Pharma AG |