Shearman et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah S Vance |
Referred: | Karen Wells Roby |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02390 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.) |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 4:33 AM CDT |
Defendant
Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
|
|
Defendant
Hudson Specialty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandon Shearman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Molly Trulen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Shearman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Tue 04/25 11:05 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Remand to State Court. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's, Hudson Specialty Insurance Company's, Motion to Withdraw Notice of Removal be and is hereby granted, and the case is remanded to the Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, State of Louisiana. The Clerk is directed to forward a certified copy of this Order to the said court. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/25/2017. (cg)with certified copy of order (cg) |
|
Att: 1 (4/25/2017) Remand Letter | ||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Remand to State Court
Fri 04/21 3:05 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Remand to State Court by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company.(Alsobrook, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/05 1:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company.(Alsobrook, John) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Compliance
Mon 03/27 3:32 PM
Notice of Compliance - List of Parties, Pleadings and Return of Service by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company.(Alsobrook, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Petition for Damages, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Notice Removal CDC, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Service of Process | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Thu 03/23 2:17 PM
DIRECTIVE OF THE CLERK regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company.(tm) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 03/23 9:54 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (jeg) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/22 4:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2017-1263 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6041618) filed by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company.Attorney John Gleason Alsobrook added to party Hudson Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Alsobrook, John) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit /Verification Petition for Removal |