D&S Marine Services, LLC v. Samsung Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lance M Africk |
Referred: | Janis Van Meerveld |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02392 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 22, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 3:48 AM CDT |
Defendant
Samsung Fire & Marine Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
D&S Marine Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
61 | 61
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 04/04 12:17 PM
ORDER granting59 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 4/4/2018. (blg) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
60 | 60
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Wed 04/04 12:16 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re59 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by D&S Marine Services, L.L.C. and ; Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?' before clicking the Next button. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte'. (blg) |
|
59 | 59
motion
Dismiss
Tue 04/03 5:37 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by D&S Marine Services, L.L.C. and by Samsung Fire & Marine Insurance Company.(Tynan, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |