Semien v. Harpo Films Inc et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | S Maurice Hicks, Jr |
Referred: | Karen L Hayes |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00432 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 21, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 21, 2022 12:07 PM CDT |
Defendant
Harpo Films Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Distribution Co
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Weinstein Co L L C
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Wayne Semien
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
71 | 71
order
Judgment
Tue 01/21 1:16 PM
JUDGMENT granting28 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot29 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 1/21/2020. (crt,McDonnell, D) Modified on 1/21/2020 to add document relation (Jones, P). (Main Document 71 replaced on 1/21/2020) (Jones, P) |
|
70 | 70
10
pgs
order
Memorandum Ruling
Tue 01/21 1:14 PM
MEMORANDUM RULING granting28 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Harpo Films Inc, Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Distribution Co, Weinstein Co L L C, denying as moot29 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Plead Fraud with Particularity filed by Harpo Films Inc, Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Distribution Co, Weinstein Co L L C. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 1/21/2020. (crt,McDonnell, D) |