Enslein v. Johnston et al
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Greg Kays |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00206 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 4:02 AM CDT |
defendant/appellant
CVM Technology
|
Represented By
|
defendant/appellant
Joe Johnston
|
Represented By
|
interested party
US Bankruptcy Court
|
|
plaintiff/appellee
Jerald S Enslein
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Mar 27 2018
ORDER AFFIRMING BANKRUPTCY COURT RULING. Signed on 3/27/18 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 06/18 11:06 AM
MANDATE of US COURT OF APPEALS as to15 Notice of Appeal filed by Joe Johnston, CVM Technology with mandate issued on 06/18/18. (Terry, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 05/29 8:24 AM
MANDATE of US COURT OF APPEALS as to15 Notice of Appeal filed by Joe Johnston, CVM Technology with mandate issued on 05/25/18. (Terry, Jason) |
|
19 | 19
appeal
USCA Judgment and/or Opinion
Tue 05/29 8:22 AM
USCA Judgment as to15 Notice of Appeal filed by Joe Johnston, CVM Technology This is a preliminary judgment of U.S. Court of Appeals; jurisdiction is not recovered until the Mandate is issued by the U.S Court of Appeals. The petition for writ of mandamus has been considered by the court and is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. (Terry, Jason) |
|
18 | 18
appeal
USCA Judgment and/or Opinion
Tue 05/29 8:18 AM
USCA Judgment as to15 Notice of Appeal filed by Joe Johnston, CVM Technology This is a preliminary judgment of U.S. Court of Appeals; jurisdiction is not recovered until the Mandate is issued by the U.S Court of Appeals. The motion to dismiss the appeal for lack of jurisdiction has been considered by the court and is granted. The motion for sanctions is denied. The motion to consolidate is denied as moot. (Terry, Jason) |
|
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule
Fri 04/27 3:16 PM
USCA Case Number from 8 circuit court of appeals is 18-1901 for15 Notice of Appeal filed by Joe Johnston, CVM Technology. Briefing schedule entered by the Court of Appeals is attached.(Terry, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Schedule | ||
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals
Wed 04/25 3:13 PM
TRANSMISSION of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals, 8th Circuit via electronic mail. Related document15 Notice of Appeal. (Terry, Jason) |
|
15 | 15
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 04/25 2:16 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by CVM Technology, Joe Johnston. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AMOWDC-5750794.(Ladwig, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Appellant's Form A | ||
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Clerk's Judgment
Tue 03/27 3:53 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (Strodtman, Tracy) |
|
13 | 13
9
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/27 3:52 PM
ORDER AFFIRMING BANKRUPTCY COURT RULING. Signed on 3/27/18 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
appeal
Appellants Reply Brief - Bankruptcy
Wed 07/05 9:34 PM
Appellant's REPLY BRIEF-Bankruptcy by CVM Technology, Joe Johnston. (Ladwig, David) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
appeal
Appellees Brief - Bankruptcy
Tue 06/20 11:36 AM
Appellee's BRIEF - Bankruptcy by Jerald S Enslein. (Bartels, Todd) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
Appellants Brief - Bankruptcy
Fri 05/19 9:23 PM
Appellant's BRIEF-Bankruptcy by CVM Technology, Joe Johnston. Appellee Brief due by 6/20/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ladwig, David) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 05/16 1:58 PM
ORDER granting8 motion for extension of time to file Appellant's brief. Appellant's brief shall be filed on or before May 19, 2017. Absent extraordinary circumstances, no additional extensions of time will be given.Signed on May 16, 2017, by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 05/15 4:54 PM
Third MOTION for extension of time to file Appellants' Brief filed by David S. Ladwig on behalf of CVM Technology, Joe Johnston. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/30/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ladwig, David) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 05/08 4:00 PM
ORDER granting6 motion for extension of time. Appellants' brief is due on or before May 15, 2017. Signed on May 8, 2017, by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 05/05 8:49 PM
Second MOTION for extension of time to file Appellants' Brief filed by David S. Ladwig on behalf of CVM Technology, Joe Johnston. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/19/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ladwig, David) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 04/06 4:20 PM
ORDER granting4 motion for extension of time. Appellants shall have until May 5, 2017, to file their opening brief. Signed on April 6, 2017, by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 04/05 6:40 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file Appellants' Brief filed by David S. Ladwig on behalf of CVM Technology, Joe Johnston. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/19/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ladwig, David) |
|
3 | 3
trial
Designation
Wed 04/05 9:20 AM
DESIGNATION OF ITEMS FOR RECORD ON APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ISSUES ON APPEAL by CVM Technology, Joe Johnston. (Ladwig, David) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
appeal
Bankruptcy Scheduling Order
Wed 03/22 11:37 AM
BANKRUPTCY SCHEDULING ORDER (Ellis, Lindsey) |
|
1 | 1
appeal
Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal
Wed 03/22 11:36 AM
NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL filed by David S. Ladwig on behalf of CVM Technology, Joe Johnston. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-04158 DRD. File received.Appellant Brief due by 4/20/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Ellis, Lindsey) |
|
Att: 1 Bankruptcy Appeal Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Appeallant's Election that Appeal be Heard by th United States District Court |