Tipton v. Berryhill
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah W Hays |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00210 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 10, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
order
Clerk's Judgment
Fri 06/22 11:54 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT- attorney fees in the amount of $7,725.68 are awarded to plaintiff. (Chorny, Traci) |
|
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Fri 06/22 11:50 AM
ORDER plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees (doc. # 27) is granted. Attorney fees in the amount of $7,725.68 are awarded to plaintiff. Signed on June 22, 2018 by Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays. (Chorny, Traci) |
|
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Reply Suggestions to Motion
Thu 04/19 10:59 AM
REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re27 MOTION for attorney fees filed by Cathleen A Shine on behalf of Plaintiff Jeffrey S. Tipton. (Shine, Cathleen) |
|
30 | 30
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 04/19 10:40 AM
RESPONSE to motion re27 MOTION for attorney fees pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Jerry L. Short on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. Reply suggestions due by 5/3/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Short, Jerry) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines
Mon 04/09 10:30 AM
ORAL ORDER granting28 motion for extension of Social Security deadlines. Defendant's response is due on or before April 24, 2018. Signed on April 9, 2018 by Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines
Fri 04/06 12:17 PM
First MOTION to extend Social Security deadlines up to and including April 24th to file a response to Plaintiff's EAJA request filed byJerry L. Short on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/20/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Short, Jerry) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Attorney Fees
Tue 03/27 5:07 PM
MOTION for attorney fees filed by Cathleen A Shine on behalf of Jeffrey S. Tipton. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/10/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Shine, Cathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Electronic Transcript
Wed 01/17 10:43 AM
ELECTRONIC TRANSCRIPT of ORAL ARGUMENT held January 10, 2018 before Judge Sarah W. Hays. Court Reporter: Lissa Whittaker, 816-914-3613, rapidtranscript@gmail.com. Number of pages: 15. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the parties' intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.mow.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. NOTICE: Attorneys must contact the court reporter for copies during this 90 day period. Notice of Intent to File Redaction of Transcripts due by 1/24/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2018. (Whittaker, Lissa) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Clerk's Judgment
Wed 01/10 10:57 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT- Per the Order filed January 10, 2018 as document 24, this case is reversed and remanded to the Social Security Administration pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), sentence 4, for the development of an adequate record in accordance with the decision of the Court, as set forth during the hearing; and it is further ORDERED that the Commissioner shall obtain from the court reporter a copy of the oral order so that the Commissioner will know on what basis this case was remanded. (Chorny, Traci) |
|
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 01/10 10:54 AM
ORDER- this case is reversed and remanded to the Social Security Administration pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), sentence 4, for the development of an adequate record in accordance with the decision of the Court, as set forth during the hearing; and it is further ORDERED that the Commissioner shall obtain from the court reporter a copy of my oral order so that the Commissioner will know on what basis this case was remanded. Signed on January 10, 2018 by Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays. (Chorny, Traci) |
|
23 | 23
minutes
Oral Argument
Wed 01/10 10:29 AM
Minute Entry for ORAL ARGUMENT Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays on 1/10/2018. Counsel appears by telephone. Oral arguments presented. Based on the information before the Court, the Court reverses and remands this matter for the reasons outlined in plaintiff's brief and arguments. Issues for remand are set out in the transcript of this hearing. Written order to follow. Time in court: 9:58am to 10:25am. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Traci Chorny, 816-512-5789. (Chorny, Traci) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
soc_sec
Social Security reply brief by plaintiff
Wed 12/06 4:13 PM
PLAINTIFFS SOCIAL SECURITY REPLY BRIEF filed by Cathleen A Shine on behalf of Jeffrey S. Tipton.(Shine, Cathleen) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Wed 12/06 3:55 PM
ORAL ORDER granting19 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply Brief. Plaintiff shall file her reply brief forthwith. Signed on December 6, 2017 by Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order
Tue 12/05 3:12 PM
ORAL ORDER Oral Argument set for 1/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6E, Kansas City (SWH) before Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays. Counsel for the parties should be prepared to present their best arguments to the Court as well as to respond to questions of the Court. At the conclusion of the argument, the Court will issue a decision. The Court will provide call-in instructions closer to the date of the hearing. Signed on December 5, 2017 by Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
File Excess Pages
Mon 12/04 4:59 PM
MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Cathleen A Shine on behalf of Jeffrey S. Tipton. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/18/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Shine, Cathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines
Tue 11/14 9:42 AM
ORAL ORDER granting17 motion for extension of Social Security deadlines. Plaintiff's reply brief is due on or about December 4, 2017. Signed on November 14, 2017 by Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines
Mon 11/13 11:26 AM
MOTION to extend Social Security deadlines filed byCathleen A Shine on behalf of Jeffrey S. Tipton. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/27/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shine, Cathleen) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
soc_sec
Social Security brief by defendant
Mon 10/23 3:37 PM
DEFENDANTS SOCIAL SECURITY BRIEF filed by Jerry L. Short on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. Plaintiff social security reply brief due by 11/13/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Short, Jerry) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines
Fri 09/22 9:17 AM
ORAL ORDER granting14 motion for extension of Social Security deadlines. Defendant's brief is due on or before October 23, 2017. Signed on September 22, 2017 by Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines
Thu 09/21 2:31 PM
First MOTION to extend Social Security deadlines until October 23rd to file Defendant's BRIEF filed byJerry L. Short on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/5/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Short, Jerry) |
|
Sunday, August 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
soc_sec
Social Security brief by plaintiff
Sun 08/13 11:14 AM
PLAINTIFFS SOCIAL SECURITY BRIEF filed by Cathleen A Shine on behalf of Jeffrey S. Tipton. Defendant social security brief due by 9/22/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Shine, Cathleen) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines
Wed 08/02 10:16 AM
ORAL ORDER granting11 motion for extension of Social Security deadlines. Plaintiff's brief is due on or before September 1, 2017. Signed on August 2, 2017 by Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines
Tue 08/01 5:19 PM
MOTION to extend Social Security deadlines filed byCathleen A Shine on behalf of Jeffrey S. Tipton. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/15/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shine, Cathleen) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Magistrate Assignment Returned
Mon 07/31 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Magistrate Assignment Returned by Nancy A. Berryhill, Jeffrey S. Tipton. Jurisdiction by magistrate accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED.(Melvin, Greg) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent | ||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines
Wed 06/28 9:06 AM
ORAL ORDER granting8 motion for extension of Social Security deadlines. Plaintiff's brief is due on or before August 2, 2017. Signed on June 28, 2017 by Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines
Tue 06/27 7:04 PM
MOTION to extend Social Security deadlines filed byCathleen A Shine on behalf of Jeffrey S. Tipton. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/11/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shine, Cathleen) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
ssanswer
Answer to Social Security complaint
Mon 05/22 3:16 PM
ANSWER to Social Security complaint filed by Jerry L. Short on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. Plaintiffs social security brief due by 7/3/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court (Short, Jerry) |
|
6 | 6
soc_sec
Submission of administrative record
Mon 05/22 3:14 PM
SUBMISSION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Jerry L. Short on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill.(Attorney Jerry L. Short added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Short, Jerry) |
|
Att: 1 001 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 002 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 004 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 006 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 007 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records, | ||
Att: 11 Medical Records, | ||
Att: 12 Medical Records, | ||
Att: 13 Medical Records, | ||
Att: 14 Medical Records, | ||
Att: 15 Medical Records, | ||
Att: 16 Medical Records, | ||
Att: 17 Medical Records | ||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
soc_sec
Return of service of Social Security Complaint
Fri 04/07 4:13 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint. United States Attorney General served on 4/3/2017. (Shine, Cathleen) |
|
4 | 4
soc_sec
Return of service of Social Security Complaint
Fri 04/07 4:12 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint. Commissioner of Social Security, Office of the Regional Counsel served on 3/28/2017. (Shine, Cathleen) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 03/24 8:12 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Ellis, Lindsey) |
||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
sscmp
Complaint - Social Security
Thu 03/23 3:38 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Cathleen A Shine on behalf of Jeffrey S. Tipton. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ifp) filed byCathleen A Shine on behalf of Jeffrey S. Tipton. Service due by 6/21/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Shine, Cathleen) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/23 11:16 AM
ORAL ORDER granting1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's counsel shall be responsible for electronically filing the Complaint within 10 days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff shall be responsible for serving process in the manner described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i). Signed on March 23, 2017 by Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/22 2:14 PM
MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cathleen A Shine on behalf of Jeffrey S. Tipton. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/5/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Attorney Cathleen A Shine added to party Jeffrey S. Tipton(pty:pla))(Shine, Cathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Assignment
Wed 03/22 3:17 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to Plaintiff's Counsel. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 4/12/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ellis, Lindsey) |