|
GPO
Mar 24 2017
ORDER - It has come to this Court's attention that the above cases are related as defined under NEGenR 1.4(a)(4)(C)(iii). Accordingly, Case No. 8:17CV92 is reassigned to Senior District Joseph F. Bataillon and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KLF)
|
|
GPO
Sep 28 2018
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO) Modified on 9/28/2018 to remove Joint Stipulation (LKO).
|
|
GPO
Oct 15 2018
AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - Jury Trial set for 4/8/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2019 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
|
|
GPO
Jan 11 2019
ORDER - Defendant's Motion for Sanctions (Filing No. 36) is granted, in part, as set out above. By January 25, 2019, Defendant shall file a motion requesting an award of costs and fees incurred in filing the Motion for Sanctions. Along with the motion, Defendant must submit an itemization of expenses incurred in connection with preparing the Motion for Sanctions. Defendant is advised that for a proper award, expenses must be reasonable and itemized with specificity. Plaintiff shall produce the tax documents by January 25, 2018. In the event the documents must be obtained from the IRS and Plaintiff is unable to obtain the tax documents from the IRS by January 25, 2018, Plaintiff shall so notify the Court in advance of the production deadline. If Defendant believes the pretrial conference and trial need to be continued due to Plaintiff's failure to timely produce the requested documents, Defendant's counsel shall contact the Court to set a status conference regarding the matter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
|
|
GPO
Mar 27 2019
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - the defendant's motion for summary judgment (Filing No. 38) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
|
|
GPO
Nov 25 2019
ORDER - that this action be dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay its own costs and attorneys' fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO)
|