Edwards v. State of Texas et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sidney A Fitzwater |
Referred: | Paul D Stickney |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00794 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 20, 2017 |
Petitioner
Willie Edwards
|
|
Respondent
Jennifer Bennett
|
|
Respondent
Lupy Valdaz
|
|
Respondent
State of Texas
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Judgment
Thu 07/20 2:30 PM
JUDGMENT: The court has entered its order adopting the findings, conclusions, and recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge in this case. It is therefore ordered and adjudged that plaintiff's action is dismissed with prejudice as frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915A and 1915(e). (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/20/2017) (aaa) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Thu 07/20 2:26 PM
Order Adopting9 Findings and Recommendations re:3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Willie Edwards. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/20/2017) (aaa) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 07/20 2:31 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:12,13. Thu Jul 20 14:31:02 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respoth
Objection to Findings and Recommendations
Thu 06/22 2:36 PM
Motion of Error and Notice of Right to Appeal/Object by Willie Edwards re:9 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 06/14 1:47 PM
FILING FEE ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 6/14/2017) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Wed 06/14 1:00 PM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and an order of the District Court, this case has been referred to the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court recommends that the complaint be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915A and 1915(e). (see order) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 6/14/2017) (mcrd) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 06/14 1:00 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Wed Jun 14 13:00:44 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 06/14 1:47 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Copy mailed to Inmate Trust Fund Department. Wed Jun 14 13:47:42 CDT 2017 (crt) Modified text on 6/14/2017 |
||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response/Objection
Fri 04/21 4:34 PM
RESPONSE filed by Willie Edwards re:6 Judge's Questionnaire. (ndt) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Response/Objection
Thu 04/13 3:48 PM
RESPONSE filed by Willie Edwards re:6 Judge's Questionnaire. (ndt) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judge's Questionnaire
Thu 04/06 12:03 PM
Judge's Questionnaire sent to Willie Edwards. Deadline to respond to the questionnaire is 30 days days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 4/6/2017) (mcrd) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 04/06 12:03 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Thu Apr 6 12:03:45 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 03/22 1:22 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Wed Mar 22 13:22:13 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/22 1:21 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Willie Edwards. (sss) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 03/22 1:20 PM
MOTION to Subpoena Evidence to Support Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Willie Edwards. (sss) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 03/22 1:20 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Willie Edwards. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sss) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Wed 03/22 1:18 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sss) |
|
1 | 1
qcref
Fitzwater
Wed 03/22 1:18 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Stickney (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sss) |