Bruning v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Barbara Mg Lynn |
Referred: | Renee Harris Toliver |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00802 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 28, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 3:46 AM CDT |
Defendant
Central Loan Administration & Reporting
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Freddie Mac "GSE"
Locke Lord et al % Thomas Yoxall and Jason Marlin 2200 Ross Avenue Suite 2800
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Locke Lord et al % Thomas G. Yoxall 2200 Ross Avenue Suite 2800
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cenlar, FSB
Hughes Watters Askananse Total Plaza 1201 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher David Bruning
6049 West Red Bird Lane
Dallas, TX 75236 |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
order
Judgment
Wed 02/28 3:55 PM
JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/28/2018) (aaa) |
|
42 | 42
1
pgs
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Wed 02/28 3:47 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING39 THE FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/28/2018) (aaa) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion for Hearing
Thu 02/08 3:47 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Findings, Conclusion and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge 39 having recommended that all of Plaintiff's claims be dismissed and this case closed, Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel 6 , Motion to Rename Defendant 10 , Motion for Transcript and Audio Recording 11 , Motion to Deny Defendant's Notice of Non-Filing and Defendant's Motion to Stay 16 , requests for hearings27 ,28 ,29 ,30 , and Amended Request for Transcript and Audio Recording 38 , as well as Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery 14 , are TERMINATED AS MOOT . In the event the district judge declines to accept the recommendation of the magistrate judge, the parties will be permitted to refile the motions. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 2/8/2018) (Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver) |
|
40 | 40
order
Order on Motion for Joinder
Thu 02/08 3:38 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: For the reasons stated in the Findings, Conclusion and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge 39 , Cenlar FSB's Joinder in Nationstar Mortgage, LLC and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation's Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support 13 , construed as a motion requesting permission to do so, is GRANTED . See Doc.39 n. 1. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 2/8/2018) (Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver) |
|
39 | 39
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Thu 02/08 3:22 PM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Defendants'8 Motion to Dismiss, should be GRANTED, Plaintiff's claims against Defendants should be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and Plaintiff's9 Motion to Reconsider, should be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Finally, upon acceptance of this recommendation, the Clerk of the Court should be directed to close this case. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 2/8/2018) (ykp) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 08/22 12:39 PM
Amended Request For Transcript and Audio Recording filed by Christopher David Bruning. (ndt) (ndt) |
|
Att: 1 (8/22/2017) Additional Page(s) Order | ||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 06/28 10:47 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot7 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff does not owe a filing fee in this matter, which was removed from state court by Defendant. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/28/2017) (chmb) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
respm
Reply
Fri 06/16 3:19 PM
REPLY filed by Christopher David Bruning re:34 Supplemental Reply. (twd) |
|
35 | 35
misc
Supplemental Document
Fri 06/16 11:05 AM
Supplemental Document by Cenlar, FSB as to34 Reply Joinder of Cenlar FSB . (Harrell, C) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Reply
Thu 06/15 9:59 AM
REPLY filed by Central Loan Administration & Reporting, Freddie Mac "GSE", Nationstar Mortgage LLC re:8 MOTION to Dismiss (Marlin, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Designation of Lead Counsel
Tue 06/13 10:46 AM
Designation of lead counsel C Ed Harrell for Defendant Cenlar, FSB. (Harrell, C) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 06/13 11:43 AM
AFFIDAVIT filed by Christopher David Bruning. (aaa) |
|
31 | 31
respm
Reply
Tue 06/13 10:40 AM
Plaintiff's Amended Reply re:8 Motion to Dismiss filed by Christopher David Bruning. (aaa) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Hearing
Tue 06/13 9:56 AM
Plaintiff's Request for Hearing re9 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Christopher David Bruning. (aaa) |
|
29 | 29
motion
Hearing
Tue 06/13 9:51 AM
Plaintiff's Request for Hearing re11 Motion for Transcript and Audio Recording filed by Christopher David Bruning. (aaa) |
|
28 | 28
motion
Hearing
Tue 06/13 9:44 AM
Plaintiff's Request for Hearing re6 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Christopher David Bruning. (aaa) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Hearing
Tue 06/13 9:41 AM
Plaintiff's Request for Hearing re17 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Christopher David Bruning. (aaa) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
sealex
Sealed and/or Ex Parte Document
Tue 05/23 8:23 AM
(Document Restricted) Sealed document, filed by Christopher David Bruning. (ran) |
|
25 | 25
order
Order on Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion
Mon 05/22 5:22 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting sealed and/or ex parte motion 5 . (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 5/22/2017) (Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Response/Objection
Thu 05/18 10:53 AM
RESPONSE filed by Christopher David Bruning re:8 MOTION to Dismiss. (ndt) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Reply
Tue 05/16 3:26 PM
REPLY filed by Freddie Mac "GSE", Nationstar Mortgage LLC re:8 MOTION to Dismiss (Marlin, Jason) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for TRO
Fri 05/12 9:32 AM
ORDER denying17 Motion for Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order to Deposit Funds Into the Registry of the Court. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/12/2017) (axm) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 05/11 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Non-Filing re:9 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Christopher David Bruning. (epm) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 05/11 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Non-Filing re:11 MOTION for Transcript and Audio Recording filed by Christopher David Bruning. (epm) |
|
19 | 19
sealex
Sealed and/or Ex Parte Document
Thu 05/11 11:59 AM
(Document Restricted) Notice of Non-Filing re: 5 Motions for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Christopher David Bruning. (epm) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 05/11 11:57 AM
NOTICE of Non-Filing re:6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Christopher David Bruning. (epm) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Wed 05/10 3:29 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Christopher David Bruning. (ndt) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 05/10 3:27 PM
MOTION to Deny Defendant's Notice15 of Non-Filing and Defendant's14 Motion to Stay Christopher David Bruning. (ndt) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 05/09 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Non-Filing re:8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Freddie Mac "GSE", Nationstar Mortgage LLC (LeBoeuf, Jason) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Stay
Tue 05/09 9:54 AM
MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Freddie Mac "GSE", Nationstar Mortgage LLC (LeBoeuf, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order granting motion to stay | ||
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Joinder
Fri 04/28 4:23 PM
MOTION to Join Motion to Dismiss filed by Central Loan Administration & Reporting Attorney Sabrina A Neff added to party Central Loan Administration & Reporting(pty:dft) (Neff, Sabrina) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/10 5:02 PM
Summons Issued as to Central Loan Administration & Reporting, Freddie Mac "GSE", Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (axm) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/10 5:00 PM
MOTION for Transcript and Audio Recording filed by Christopher David Bruning. (axm) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 04/06 3:17 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Rename Defendant filed by Christopher David Bruning. (mcrd) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Reconsideration
Mon 04/03 10:31 AM
MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Christopher David Bruning. (sss) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss
Wed 03/29 3:52 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Freddie Mac "GSE", Nationstar Mortgage LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (LeBoeuf, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/29 12:45 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christopher David Bruning. (sss) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Appoint Counsel
Wed 03/29 10:10 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Christopher David Bruning. (ykp) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/22 2:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Freddie Mac "GSE", Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Marlin, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Wed 03/22 12:32 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (epm) |
|
2 | 2
qcref
Lynn
Wed 03/22 12:30 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/22 9:56 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8291164) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Marlin, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 03/22 12:32 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,3. Wed Mar 22 12:32:46 CDT 2017 (crt) |