Hooks v. Knight Transportation Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane J Boyle |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00807 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 15, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 4:00 AM CDT |
Defendant
Michael John Stevens
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Knight Transportation Inc
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
ADR Provider
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chanita Hooks
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation
Fri 09/15 5:28 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice by Knight Transportation Inc. (Tenney, Nathan) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Public Entry)
Mon 09/18 8:47 AM
Civil Case Terminated per17 Stipulation of Dismissal. (sss) |
||
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 08/30 11:08 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The parties' Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines15 is GRANTED. The parties have indicated that all matters in controversy have been settled. Doc. 15. Therefore, the parties are ORDERED to file a joint stipulation of dismissal or agreed final judgment by Friday, September 29, 2017. In the interim, all case deadlines are STAYED. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/30/2017) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 08/30 11:09 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:16. Wed Aug 30 11:09:09 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 08/30 11:35 AM
***DISREGARD - NOTICE OF DELIVERY ENTERED IN ERROR*** Modified on 8/30/2017 |
||
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Stay
Tue 08/29 6:06 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines and Notice of Settlement filed by Knight Transportation Inc (Tenney, Nathan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/11 10:54 AM
DEFENDANTS' FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL ANSWER to Complaint filed by Knight Transportation Inc, Michael John Stevens. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (epm) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Fri 08/11 10:31 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting12 Motion. The Court GRANTS Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Defendants' First Amended Original Answer. The Court directs the Clerk to enter Defendants' First Amended Original Answer (Doc. 12-1) as of the date of this Order. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/11/2017) (chmb) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Leave to File
Thu 08/10 2:09 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' First Amended Original Answer filed by Knight Transportation Inc (Tenney, Nathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1 | ||
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order For ADR
Mon 05/22 10:20 AM
MEDIATION ORDER.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 9/1/2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/22/2017) (epm) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 05/22 10:21 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. Mon May 22 10:21:36 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 05/18 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Joint Report Naming Mediator re:9 Scheduling Order,, filed by Knight Transportation Inc, Michael John Stevens (Mayer, Zach) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 04/24 9:13 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning 1/29/2018 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 5/4/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 5/4/2017. Deadline for mediation is on or before 9/1/2017. Discovery due by 10/2/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2017. Pretrial Order due by 1/16/2018. Pretrial Materials due by 1/16/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/21/2017) (twd) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/21 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures filed by Knight Transportation Inc, Michael John Stevens (Mayer, Zach) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/19 11:21 AM
NOTICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures of Plaintiff filed by Chanita Hooks (Browne, Spencer) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Status Report
Thu 04/13 2:24 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Knight Transportation Inc. (Mayer, Zach) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/29 1:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chanita Hooks. (Browne, Spencer) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 03/24 8:32 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Fri Mar 24 08:32:08 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Status Report Order
Fri 03/24 8:31 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 4/14/2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/23/2017) (ran) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 03/23 8:36 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Thu Mar 23 08:36:52 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
qcref
Boyle
Thu 03/23 8:34 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ran) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/22 3:53 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Knight Transportation, Inc., Michael John Stevens. (Mayer, Zach) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/22 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 160th District Court, Dallas County, case number DC 17-02209 filed by Michael John Stevens, Knight Transportation, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8292869) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Mayer, Zach) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Index of Matters Being Filed, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Cover Sheet Supplement |