Dearborn National Life Insurance Company v. Oliphant et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert Pitman |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00249 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Interpleader Action |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 4:37 AM CDT |
Defendant
Dustin Oliphant
216 Sycamore Drive
Hitchcock, TX 77563 |
|
Defendant
Dylan Oliphant
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnny E. Oliphant
|
|
Plaintiff
Dearborn National Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
misc
Acknowledgment of District Case Transfer
Wed 07/26 10:33 AM
Case transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in Southern District of Texas District as case number 4:17-cv-02274. (ml) |
||
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Transfer Case
Tue 07/25 10:44 AM
ORDER GRANTING12 Motion to Approve Interpleader and Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (ml) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Supplement
Mon 07/24 9:08 AM
PROPOSED ORDER to12 MOTION to Approve Interpleader and Transfer Venue by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company. (MacRae, Andrew) Modified on 7/24/2017 to edit text (ml) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 07/14 10:58 AM
MOTION to Approve Interpleader and Transfer Venue by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company.(MacRae, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 06/07 2:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company. Dustin Oliphant served on 5/6/2017, answer due 5/30/2017. (MacRae, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 05/25 12:41 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Dustin Oliphant.(ml) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/22 12:09 PM
ORIGINAL ANSWER to1 Complaint by Johnny E. Oliphant.(ml) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/19 12:22 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Dylan Oliphant.(Fuller, Krista) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 05/15 10:13 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company. Johnny E. Oliphant served on 4/29/2017, answer due 5/22/2017. (MacRae, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 05/03 3:08 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company as to Dylan Oliphant. Waiver sent on 3/22/2017, answer due 5/22/2017. (MacRae, Andrew) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/21 3:24 PM
Summons Issued as to Dustin Oliphant. (ml) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 04/21 2:40 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company. (MacRae, Andrew) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/17 4:40 PM
Summons Issued as to Johnny E. Oliphant. (ml) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/17 4:05 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company. (MacRae, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 1:20 PM
COMPLAINT in Interpleader ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9417800). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company.(MacRae, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/22 1:41 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (gr) |