Boyd v. City of Round Rock and its Police Department
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Sam Sparks |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00251 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race) |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 3:25 AM CDT |
Defendant
Alain Babin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allen Banks
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City of Round Rock, Texas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nick Simpson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Andrew Boyd
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
City of Round Rock and its Police Department
Terminated: 03/29/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 12/14 12:05 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw) |
|
32 | 32
10
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Thu 12/14 12:04 PM
ORDER GRANTING Defendants' converted19 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Boyd's federal claims. ORDER that Boyd's state law claims are DISMISSEDWITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Fri 10/06 3:40 PM
RESPONSE in Support, filed by Alain Babin, Allen Banks, City of Round Rock, Texas, Nick Simpson, re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Allen Banks, Defendant Alain Babin, Defendant City of Round Rock, Texas, Defendant Nick Simpson(Thompson, Mike) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order | ||
30 | 30
adr
ADR Report - Other
Fri 10/06 1:39 PM
ADR Report Filed - Parties ADR Report by Alain Babin, Allen Banks, City of Round Rock, Texas, Nick Simpson(Thompson, Mike) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Supplement
Fri 09/29 1:42 PM
SUPPLEMENT Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt5) by David Andrew Boyd. (Poncio, Adam) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 09/11 12:36 PM
ANSWER to15 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Alain Babin, Allen Banks, City of Round Rock, Texas, Nick Simpson.(Thompson, Mike) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 08/30 5:18 PM
ORDER re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Allen Banks, Alain Babin, City of Round Rock, Texas, Nick Simpson. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jf) |
|
26 | 26
minutes
Miscellaneous Hearing
Wed 08/30 2:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: All Pending Motions Hearing held on 8/30/2017 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik)(jf) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 08/21 3:30 PM
ORDER (All Pending Motions Hearing set for 8/30/2017 at 9:00 AM before Judge Sam Sparks). Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jf) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Filing
Fri 08/04 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Filing 08 04-2017 DefendantsInitialDisclosures by Alain Babin, Allen Banks, City of Round Rock, Texas, Nick Simpson (Thompson, Mike) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Wed 07/26 11:40 AM
RESPONSE in Support, filed by Alain Babin, Allen Banks, City of Round Rock, Texas, Nick Simpson, re19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Allen Banks, Defendant Alain Babin, Defendant City of Round Rock, Texas, Defendant Nick Simpson (Thompson, Mike) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/20 4:36 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by David Andrew Boyd. (Poncio, Adam) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Thu 07/20 4:15 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by David Andrew Boyd. (Poncio, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 07/19 5:54 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by David Andrew Boyd, re19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Allen Banks, Defendant Alain Babin, Defendant City of Round Rock, Texas, Defendant Nick Simpson Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Poncio, Adam) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 06/23 12:17 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Alain Babin, Allen Banks, City of Round Rock, Texas, Nick Simpson.(Thompson, Mike) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 06/16 4:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 8/18/2017, Docket Call set for 6/28/2019 at 11:00 AM and trial in the month of July 2019 before Judge Sam Sparks, ADR Report Deadline due by 10/6/2017, Amended Pleadings due by 8/18/2017, Discovery due by 11/16/2018, Joinder of Parties due by 8/18/2017, Motions due by 8/31/2018. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jf) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 06/15 3:49 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Alain Babin, Allen Banks, City of Round Rock, Texas, Nick Simpson. (Thompson, Mike) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Thu 06/15 3:47 PM
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by Alain Babin, Allen Banks, City of Round Rock, Texas, Nick Simpson.(Thompson, Mike) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 06/09 2:08 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alain Babin, Allen Banks, City of Round Rock, Texas, Nick Simpson amending3 First Amended Complaint,1 Complaint, filed by David Andrew Boyd.(jf) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Leave to File
Fri 06/09 1:43 PM
ORDER DISMISSING5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; DISMISSING8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; GRANTING9 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jf) |
|
13 | 13
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 06/09 1:25 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Alain Babin, Allen Banks, City of Round Rock, Texas, Nick Simpson, re9 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff David Andrew Boyd (Thompson, Mike) |
|
12 | 12
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Fri 06/09 1:22 PM
RESPONSE in Support, filed by City of Round Rock, Texas, re5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant City of Round Rock, Texas (Thompson, Mike) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order
Thu 06/08 4:46 PM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plaintiff shall submit a scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/21/2017. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jf) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 06/02 8:42 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by David Andrew Boyd, re5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant City of Round Rock, Texas Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Poncio, Adam) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 06/02 8:29 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by David Andrew Boyd. (Poncio, Adam) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 06/02 4:29 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim andDefendantsAssertionsOf Immunity by Alain Babin, Allen Banks, Nick Simpson.(Thompson, Mike) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
notice
Deficiency Notice
Fri 06/02 3:56 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Multiple pleadings must be filed as separate documents. Re-file your Response and Motion for Leave to File Document separately re 6 Response to Motion (jf) |
|
6 | 6
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 06/02 1:49 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by David Andrew Boyd, re5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant City of Round Rock, Texas Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt 5) and Request for Leave to File Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Poncio, Adam) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 05/19 4:18 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of Round Rock, Texas.(Thompson, Mike) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 04/07 1:40 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Andrew Boyd as to Alain Babin. Waiver sent on 4/5/2017, answer due 6/5/2017; Allen Banks. Waiver sent on 4/5/2017, answer due 6/5/2017; Nick Simpson. Waiver sent on 4/5/2017, answer due 6/5/2017. (Poncio, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 03/29 2:53 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Round Rock and its Police Department amending1 Complaint., filed by David Andrew Boyd.(Poncio, Adam) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 03/24 8:06 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Andrew Boyd as to City of Round Rock and its Police Department. Waiver sent on 3/22/2017, answer due 5/22/2017. (Poncio, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 3:06 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9418535). No Summons requested at this time, filed by DAVID A BOYD.(Poncio, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/22 4:18 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Sam Sparks. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd) |
||
misc
Jury Demand
Wed 03/22 4:18 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by David Andrew Boyd. (afd) |