Aportela v. Davis
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Philip R Martinez |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00085 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 30, 2018 |
Notice Only Party
Laura Haney
|
|
Petitioner
Sergio Aportela
|
|
Respondent
Lorie Davis
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Mon 05/14 3:16 PM
Certified Mail Return Receipt of15 Memorandum Opinion and Order,16 Judgment (scf) |
|
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Fri 05/04 12:42 PM
Certified & Regular Mail Receipt of15 Memorandum Opinion and Order,16 Judgment (scf) |
|
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Judgment
Mon 04/30 5:49 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) |
|
15 | 15
15
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order
Mon 04/30 5:47 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ECF. No. 4 is DENIED and his civil cause is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PETITIONER IS DENIED A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. IT IS FURTHER ORDREED THAT ALL PENDING MOTIONS, IF ANY ARE DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Response to Habeas Petition
Tue 06/20 4:22 PM
RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Sergio Aportela.(dt) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Fri 06/16 10:24 AM
Certified Mail Return Receipt of11 Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney (scf) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Thu 06/08 5:30 PM
Certified & Regular Mail Receipt of11 Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney (scf) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Thu 06/08 10:37 AM
ORDER GRANTING8 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
State Court Records
Mon 06/05 10:35 AM
State Court Records Filed.(Manojlovich, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 1 Opinion DA1, | ||
Att: 2 2 Petition for Discretionary Review DA2, | ||
Att: 3 3 Appellants Brief DA3, | ||
Att: 4 4 States Brief DA4, | ||
Att: 5 5 RR 1 of 8 DA5, | ||
Att: 6 6 RR 2 of 8 DA6, | ||
Att: 7 7 RR 3 of 8 DA7, | ||
Att: 8 8 RR 4 of 8 DA8, | ||
Att: 9 9 RR 5 of 8 DA9, | ||
Att: 10 10 RR 6 of 8 DA10, | ||
Att: 11 11 RR 7 of 8 DA11, | ||
Att: 12 12 RR 8 of 8 DA12, | ||
Att: 13 13 CR Supp Record DA13, | ||
Att: 14 14 CR DA14, | ||
Att: 15 15 WR-84,883-01 ACTION TAKEN WRIT 9 7-2016 | ||
Att: 16 16 WR-84,883-01 EXTENSION RQST 73.5 DISP APPLNT 4 14-2016 | ||
Att: 17 17 WR-84,883-01 EXTENSION RQST APPLNT 4 6-2016 | ||
Att: 18 18 WR-84,883-01 SUPP-CLERK RECORD WRIT 5 16-2016 VOL 1 OF 3_Part1, | ||
Att: 19 19 WR-84,883-01 SUPP-CLERK RECORD WRIT 5 16-2016 VOL 1 OF 3_Part2, | ||
Att: 20 20 WR-84,883-01 SUPP-CLERK RECORD WRIT 5 16-2016 VOL 2 OF 3_Part1, | ||
Att: 21 21 WR-84,883-01 SUPP-CLERK RECORD WRIT 5 16-2016 VOL 2 OF 3_Part2, | ||
Att: 22 22 WR-84,883-01 SUPP-CLERK RECORD WRIT 5 16-2016 VOL 3 OF 3_Part1, | ||
Att: 23 23 WR-84,883-01 SUPP-CLERK RECORD WRIT 5 16-2016 VOL 3 OF 3_Part2, | ||
Att: 24 24 WR-84,883-01 WRIT RECEIVED WRIT 5-23-2016 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Response to Habeas Petition
Mon 06/05 10:24 AM
RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Lorie Davis.(Manojlovich, Jessica) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Substitute Attorney
Fri 05/26 10:04 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney with Brief in Support by Lorie Davis.(Manojlovich, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 05/10 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa L. Hargis on behalf of Lorie Davis. Attorney Melissa L. Hargis added to party Lorie Davis(pty:res) (Hargis, Melissa) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Mon 04/24 10:19 AM
Certified Mail Return Receipt of2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis,4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,3 Order (scf) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Fri 04/07 5:17 PM
Certified & Regular Mail Receipt of2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis,4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,3 Order (scf) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Thu 04/06 4:17 PM
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 0; receipt number XXXXX), filed by Sergio Aportela.(scf) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order
Thu 04/06 4:13 PM
ORDER FOR RESPONDENT TO ANSWER. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/06 4:11 PM
ORDER GRANTING1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (scf) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 04/06 5:25 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Lorie Davis answer due 6/6/2017. (mt) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/22 11:49 AM
MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sergio Aportela.(ec) |
|
Att: 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibits, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibits pages 1-14 | ||
misc
To be Referred to EP Mag Judge
Wed 03/22 11:52 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (ec) |