Longoria v. Davis
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Orlando L Garcia |
Referred: | Henry J Bemporad |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00224 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
appeal
Appeal Record Accepted and Available Electronically
Fri 06/02 3:34 PM
Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal has been accepted by the 5th Circuit re9 Notice of Appeal,. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions[LINK:here] (fs) |
||
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 05/08 2:48 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Angel Longoria. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out[LINK:Form DKT-13] (Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (rg) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
misc
Remark (No Doc#)
Wed 04/26 10:00 AM
Document Nos. 6 & 7 sent to Petitioner at his new address. (rg) |
||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Wed 04/26 9:46 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Angel Longoria. (rg) |
|
7 | 7
order
Judgment
Tue 04/25 12:46 PM
JUDGMENT - Petitioner Angel Longoria's petition for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 (Docket Entry 1) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Certificate of Appealability is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order ~Util - Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/25 12:42 PM
DISMISSAL ORDER re1 2254 Petition, filed by Angel Longoria, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as time-barred. CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. This Court DENIES Petitioner a certificate of appealability. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rg) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Tue 04/11 10:27 AM
RESPONSE to4 Order to Show Cause by Angel Longoria.(rg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 03/28 10:29 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Lorie Davis. Petitioner must show cause within thirty days of the date of this Order why his 2254 petition should not be dismissed as barred by limitations. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (rg) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/28 10:20 AM
ORDER GRANTING2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (rg) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/22 8:47 AM
MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Angel Longoria. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (dtg) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 8:46 AM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by Angel Longoria.(dtg) Modified TEXT TO REFLECT FILING OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND NOT A COMPLAINT on 3/22/2017 (dtg) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Copy of Envelope |