Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana v. Virata et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | David A Ezra |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00230 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 3:33 AM CDT |
Counter Defendant
Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
Melanie McCarthy
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
Charlotte Menchaca
|
Represented By
|
Counter Plaintiff
Mariano Jones Virata
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Melanie McCarthy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Charlotte Menchaca
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mariano Jones Virata
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana
Hanna & Plaut, LLP 211 E. 7th Street Suite 600
Austin, TX 78701 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 08/09 3:39 PM
ORDER GRANTING26 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej) |
|
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 08/09 3:38 PM
ORDER VACATING 27 Order. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Dismiss
Thu 08/09 10:00 AM
MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana.(Hanna, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 08/08 5:35 PM
NOTICE of Settlement of Underlying Suit by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana (Hanna, Catherine) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Fri 06/15 2:26 PM
ORDER DISMISSING17 Motion for Summary Judgment; DISMISSING18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Advisory to the Court
Thu 06/14 12:22 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana. (Hanna, Catherine) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 01/25 3:59 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana, re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana(Hanna, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit G | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Filing
Thu 01/25 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Filing Plaintiff's First Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana (Hanna, Catherine) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 01/22 4:40 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana, re18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Charlotte Menchaca, Melanie McCarthy, Mariano Jones Virata (Hanna, Catherine) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 01/18 2:58 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Melanie McCarthy, Charlotte Menchaca, Mariano Jones Virata, re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana(Scheuerman, Scot) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Virata Affidavit | ||
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 01/08 10:32 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Melanie McCarthy, Charlotte Menchaca, Mariano Jones Virata.(Scheuerman, Scot) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Summary Judgment Exhibits | ||
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 01/05 1:45 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana.(Hanna, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Filing
Mon 09/11 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Filing Plaintiff's Designation of Witnesses, Experts, and Exhibit Disclosures by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana (Hanna, Catherine) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Pretrial Disclosures
Mon 09/11 3:25 PM
Pretrial Disclosures of Testifying Experts by Melanie McCarthy, Charlotte Menchaca, Mariano Jones Virata. (Scheuerman, Scot) |
|
14 | 14
adr
ADR Report - Other
Mon 09/11 2:08 PM
ADR Report Filed - Joint Report on Alternative Dispute Resolution by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana(Hanna, Catherine) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Pretrial Disclosures
Tue 08/15 2:01 PM
Pretrial Disclosures by Melanie McCarthy, Charlotte Menchaca, Mariano Jones Virata. (Scheuerman, Scot) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Pretrial Disclosures
Mon 08/14 2:35 PM
Pretrial Disclosures by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana. (Hanna, Catherine) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 07/31 1:59 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 1/8/2018 (aej) |
||
utility
Notice of Correction
Mon 07/31 2:00 PM
Notice of Correction:***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT ENTRY HAS BEEN EDITED TO REFLECT CORRECTED MOTIONS DEADLINE*** re11 Scheduling Order,. (aej) |
||
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 07/28 3:48 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 9/11/2017, Amended Pleadings due by 10/10/2017, Discovery due by 12/8/2017, Joinder of Parties due by 10/10/2017, Motions due by 1/8/2017. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Thu 07/27 2:04 PM
Scheduling Recommendations Joint Rule 26(F) Discovery Plan by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana. (Hanna, Catherine) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Thu 07/27 1:49 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana. (Hanna, Catherine) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Wed 07/12 4:32 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint . Attorney Felix Gonzalez added to party Mariano Jones Virata(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana by Mariano Jones Virata.(Gonzalez, Felix) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Notice of Right to Consent to Magistrate Trial
Mon 07/10 4:51 PM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations and Advisory Concerning Magistrate Judge Assignment. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej) |
|
Saturday, May 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Sat 05/20 1:27 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint . Attorney Scot Tyler Scheuerman added to party Melanie McCarthy(pty:dft), Attorney Scot Tyler Scheuerman added to party Charlotte Menchaca(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana by Melanie McCarthy, Charlotte Menchaca.(Scheuerman, Scot) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/23 2:41 PM
Summons Issued as to Melanie McCarthy. (mgr) Modified on 3/23/2017 to correct date(mgr) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/23 2:38 PM
Summons Issued as to Mariano Jones Virata. (mgr) Modified on 3/23/2017, to correct date (mgr) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/23 11:19 AM
Summons Issued as to Charlotte Menchaca. (mgr) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 03/23 10:05 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana. for Mariano Jones Virata, Charlotte Menchaca and Melanie McCarthy (Hanna, Catherine) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/22 11:59 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9417371), filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana.(Hanna, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/23 9:21 AM
Case Assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr) |
||
misc
To be Referred to SA Mag Judge
Thu 03/23 9:22 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (mgr) |